Garay v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Allen Martin Garay
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00065
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Atty General served on 2/8/2021. (asc)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/1/2021. (amb)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Allen Martin Garay. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Skaar, Daniel)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 3/22/2021 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 5/3/2021; defendant's response due 6/14/2021; plaintiff's reply due 6/29/2021. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/19/2021 GRANTING #3 plaintiff's motion to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
January 19, 2021 Transmit #1 Complaint and #4 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
January 14, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Allen Martin Garay. (Skaar, Daniel)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Allen Martin Garay. (Skaar, Daniel)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Allen Martin Garay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Unfavorable Notice of Decision, #3 Exhibit Appeals Council Denial)(Skaar, Daniel)
January 14, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garay v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Martin Garay
Represented By: Daniel A Skaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?