La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings LLC v. Juarez, et al
Plaintiff: La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC and La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings LLC
Defendant: Pedro Juarez, Jr., Lindo Michoacan Mexican Restaurant, LLC, Pedro Juarez, Jr and Lindo Michoacan Mexican Restaurant LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00076
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVING #16 Stipulation to extend to March 31, 2021 the time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Pedro Juarez, Jr, and Lindo Michoacan Mexican Restaurant LLC., signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 03/10/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 9, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION Regarding Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint)(Smies, Jonathan)
March 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan T Smies on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathan T. Smies (Smies, Jonathan)
February 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Emery K Harlan on behalf of La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings LLC. (Harlan, Emery)
February 25, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings LLC. Lindo Michoacan Mexican Restaurant LLC served on 2/18/2021. (tlf)
February 25, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings LLC. Pedro Juarez, Jr served on 2/18/2021. (tlf)
February 25, 2021 Filing 11 INCORRECT EVENT CHOSEN; see #13 . ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint on 2/18/2021 by Pedro Juarez Jr on behalf of Lindo Michoacan Mexican Restaurant LLC (Andrews, Eric) Modified on 2/25/2021 (tlf).
February 25, 2021 Filing 10 INCORRECT EVENT CHOSEN; see #12 . ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint on 2/18/2021 by Pedro Juarez Jr (Andrews, Eric) Modified on 2/25/2021 (tlf).
February 25, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #10 Admission of Service and #11 Admission of Service. The incorrect event was chosen. The correct event is Summons Returned Executed. This document will be docketed by the clerk using the correct event and does not need to be refiled. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (tlf)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Andrews, Eric)
January 20, 2021 Summons Issued as to Pedro Juarez, Jr, Lindo Michoacan Mexican Restaurant LLC. (tlf)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (tlf)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings LLC (Andrews, Eric)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings LLC (Andrews, Eric)
January 19, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
January 19, 2021 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified to remove punctuation - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (tlf)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC (Andrews, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC (Andrews, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric L Andrews on behalf of La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric L. Andrews (Andrews, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC. (Andrews, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Pedro Juarez, Jr., Lindo Michoacan Mexican Restaurant, LLC by La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3701985) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2021: #2 Exhibits A1-A7 (with bookmarks)) (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings LLC v. Juarez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Juarez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindo Michoacan Mexican Restaurant, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Juarez, Jr
Represented By: Jonathan T Smies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindo Michoacan Mexican Restaurant LLC
Represented By: Jonathan T Smies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Eric L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings LLC
Represented By: Eric L Andrews
Represented By: Emery K Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?