Rutherford et al v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Plaintiff: Erik J Rutherford, Lori A Rutherford and Green Bay Area Public Schools Group Benefit Plan
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv00311
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 4/15/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2021, Discovery due by 1/31/2022, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 8/31/2021, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 11/30/2021, Motions due by 3/31/2022, Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 5/3/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
April 15, 2021 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: The Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2021 is removed from the court's calendar. (cc: all counsel) (mac)
April 1, 2021 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Andrews, Eric)
March 30, 2021 Filing 12 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Andrews, Eric)
March 25, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Counterclaim and Cross-Claim of Involuntary Plaintiff by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.(Andrews, Eric) Modified on 3/25/2021 (tlf).
March 19, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY filed by All Plaintiffs to #9 Crossclaim filed by Green Bay Area Public Schools Group Benefit Plan . (Tease, Ralph) Modified on 3/19/2021 (tlf).
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Lori A Rutherford, Erik J Rutherford , and COUNTERCLAIM against Wal-Mart Stores Inc filed by Green Bay Area Public Schools Group Benefit Plan.(Mayer, Matthew) Modified on 3/19/2021 (tlf).
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S Mayer on behalf of Green Bay Area Public Schools Group Benefit Plan. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew S. Mayer (Mayer, Matthew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Vigil on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Vincent J. Vigil (Vigil, Vincent)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.(Andrews, Eric)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Tease, Ralph)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Tease, Ralph)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2021 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 4/14/2021. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Andrews, Eric)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores Inc from Brown County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2021CV000186 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3761998) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Service of Process Transmittal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Eric)
March 11, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutherford et al v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik J Rutherford
Represented By: Ralph J Tease, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori A Rutherford
Represented By: Ralph J Tease, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Bay Area Public Schools Group Benefit Plan
Represented By: Matthew S Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Eric L Andrews
Represented By: Vincent Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?