Leden v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: SueEllen Leden
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00527
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 FILING FEE Received: $402, receipt number 265MLRI. (jcl)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/17/2021 DENYING #3 plaintiff's motion to proceed without prepaying filing fee. Full filing fee due by 6/11/2021; failure to pay by deadline will result in dismissal of case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by SueEllen Leden. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Skaar, Daniel)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by SueEllen Leden. (Skaar, Daniel)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by SueEllen Leden. (Skaar, Daniel)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by SueEllen Leden (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Unfavorable Notice of Decision, #3 Appeals Council Denial, #4 Appeals Council Extension)(Skaar, Daniel)
April 26, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leden v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SueEllen Leden
Represented By: Daniel A Skaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?