Faust et al v. Vilsack et al
Plaintiff: Adam P Faust, Jon Stevens, Joseph W Schmitz, Christopher C Baird, Jay T Slaba, Theodore G Shields, Jr, Cheryl J Ash, Teena J Banducci, Lori J Watkins, Brandon D Banducci, Jonathan P Stevens, James C Ash and Christopher D Bohnenkamp
Defendant: Thomas J Vilsack, Zack Duchaneaux and Zach Ducheneaux
Petitioner: Lee Perry and Corey Lea
Amicus Curiae: Community Farm Alliance, Rural Coalition, Kansas Black Farmers Association, Cottage House Inc, Intertribal Agriculture Council, Family Farm Defenders, Woman Food & Agriculture Network, National Black Farmers Association, California FarmLink, HEAL Food Alliance, Texas Coalition of Rural Landowners, National Sustainable Agriculture Coalition, Operation Spring Plant Inc, Farm Aid, National Family Farm Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council Inc, National Latino Farmers and Ranchers Trade Association, World Farmers, Steward Holdings Inc, Rural Advancement Foundation International-USA, National Young Farmers Coalition, North Carolina Association of Black Lawyers Land Loss Prevention Project, Oklahoma Black Historical Research Project Inc, Association of American Indian Farmers, Rural Advancement Fund of the National Sharecroppers Fund Inc, CFA, American Indian Mothers Inc, Arkansas Land and Farm Development Corporation and Land Stewardship Project
Case Number: 1:2021cv00548
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 45 RESPONSE filed by All Defendants re #44 Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion (Newton, Emily) Modified on 6/25/2021 (tlf).
June 25, 2021 Filing 44 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Authority In Light of Wynn v. Vilsack, M.D. Fla.. (Lennington, Daniel) Modified on 6/25/2021 (tlf).
June 24, 2021 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Conference held on 6/24/2021. (Tape #062421) (mac)
June 24, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 6/24/2021 02:30 PM before Judge William C Griesbach to address the status of the case in light of the decision and order granting the motion for preliminary injunction in Case No. 21-514-MMH-JRK, Wynn v. Vilsack (M.D. Fla. June 23, 2021). Instructions: Participants are to call in to 1-888-273-3658, using Access Code 4416978, and Security Code 1234. Please be sure to call in prior to the time that the hearing is scheduled to begin so that there is no disruption to the court proceeding. To ensure a clear record of the hearing, participants should not use a speaker phone. Unless otherwise excused, all participants are expected to remain on the call for the duration of the conference. Please contact the Office of the Clerk at 920-455-7381 if you have any questions. All participants are to confirm their appearance with the Clerk prior to the date of the hearing. Verification of your participation should be sent to wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(tlf)
June 23, 2021 Filing 43 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Lennington, Daniel)
June 23, 2021 Filing 42 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF in Opposition filed by American Indian Mothers Inc, Arkansas Land and Farm Development Corporation, California FarmLink, Community Farm Alliance (CFA), Cottage House Inc, Family Farm Defenders, Farm Aid, HEAL (Health, Environment, Agriculture, Labor) Food Alliance, Intertribal Agriculture Council (IAC), Kansas Black Farmers Association, Land Stewardship Project, National Family Farm Coalition (NFFC), National Latino Farmers and Ranchers Trade Association, National Sustainable Agriculture Coalition (NSAC), National Young Farmers Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council Inc, North Carolina Association of Black Lawyers Land Loss Prevention Project (LLPP), Oklahoma Black Historical Research Project, Inc., Operation Spring Plant, Inc., Rural Advancement Foundation International-USA (RAFI-USA), Rural Advancement Fund of the National Sharecroppers Fund Inc, Rural Coalition, Steward Holdings, Inc. (US), Texas Coalition of Rural Landowners, Woman, Food & Agriculture Network (WFAN), World Farmers re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Ex A-Declaration of Alfonso A. Abeyta, #2 Ex B-Declaration of Nathaniel Bradford, #3 Ex C-Declaration of Leroy Brinkley, Jr., #4 Ex D-Declaration of Henry Brown, #5 Ex E-Declaration of Jane Doe, #6 Ex F-Declaration of George McNary III, #7 Ex G-Statement of Cassandra P., #8 Ex H-Statement of Rural Coalition, #9 Ex I-Declaration of Mykia Xiong)(Stokes-Hough, Keisha) Modified on 6/23/2021 (tlf).
June 23, 2021 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by American Indian Mothers, Inc. (AIMI), Arkansas Land and Farm Development Corporation (ALFDC), California FarmLink, Community Farm Alliance (CFA), Cottage House, Inc. (CHI), Family Farm Defenders (FFD), Farm Aid, HEAL (Health, Environment, Agriculture, Labor) Food Alliance, Intertribal Agriculture Council (IAC), Kansas Black Farmers Association (KBFA), Land Stewardship Project (LSP), National Family Farm Coalition (NFFC), National Latino Famers and Ranchers Trade Association (NLFRTA), National Sustainable Agriculture Coalition (NSAC), National Young Farmers Coalition (Young Farmers), Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. (NRDC), North Carolina Association of Black Lawyers Land Loss Prevention Project (LLPP), Oklahoma Black Historical Research Project, Inc., Operation Spring Plant, Inc., Rural Advancement Foundation International-USA (RAFI-USA), Rural Advancement Fund of the National Sharecroppers Fund, Inc. (RAF), Rural Coalition, Steward Holdings, Inc. (US), Texas Coalition of Rural Landowners, Woman, Food & Agriculture Network (WFAN), World Farmers. (Stokes-Hough, Keisha)
June 23, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M Jordan on behalf of American Indian Mothers, Inc. (AIMI), Arkansas Land and Farm Development Corporation (ALFDC), California FarmLink, Community Farm Alliance (CFA), Cottage House, Inc. (CHI), Family Farm Defenders (FFD), Farm Aid, HEAL (Health, Environment, Agriculture, Labor) Food Alliance, Intertribal Agriculture Council (IAC), Kansas Black Farmers Association (KBFA), Land Stewardship Project (LSP), National Family Farm Coalition (NFFC), National Latino Famers and Ranchers Trade Association (NLFRTA), National Sustainable Agriculture Coalition (NSAC), National Young Farmers Coalition (Young Farmers), Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. (NRDC), North Carolina Association of Black Lawyers Land Loss Prevention Project (LLPP), Oklahoma Black Historical Research Project, Inc., Operation Spring Plant, Inc., Rural Advancement Foundation International-USA (RAFI-USA), Rural Advancement Fund of the National Sharecroppers Fund, Inc. (RAF), Rural Coalition, Steward Holdings, Inc. (US), Texas Coalition of Rural Landowners, Woman, Food & Agriculture Network (WFAN), World Farmers. Attorney(s) appearing: Alexandra M. Jordan (Jordan, Alexandra)
June 23, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Keisha Stokes-Hough on behalf of Rural Coalition, Intertribal Agriculture Council (IAC), North Carolina Association of Black Lawyers Land Loss Prevention Project (LLPP), Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. (NRDC), Rural Advancement Fund of the National Sharecroppers Fund, Inc. (RAF), National Latino Famers and Ranchers Trade Association (NLFRTA), American Indian Mothers, Inc. (AIMI), Arkansas Land and Farm Development Corporation (ALFDC), Cottage House, Inc. (CHI), Family Farm Defenders (FFD), Kansas Black Farmers Association (KBFA), Land Stewardship Project (LSP), National Young Farmers Coalition (Young Farmers), Oklahoma Black Historical Research Project, Inc., Operation Spring Plant, Inc., Texas Coalition of Rural Landowners, World Farmers, Farm Aid, HEAL (Health, Environment, Agriculture, Labor) Food Alliance, National Family Farm Coalition (NFFC), Rural Advancement Foundation International-USA (RAFI-USA), National Sustainable Agriculture Coalition (NSAC), California FarmLink, Community Farm Alliance (CFA), Woman, Food & Agriculture Network (WFAN), Steward Holdings, Inc. (US). Attorney(s) appearing: Keisha Stokes-Hough (Attachments: #1 Disclosure Statement of Amici Curiae The Rural Coalition, The Intertribal Agriculture Council, North Carolina Association of Black Lawyers Land Loss Prevention Project, and 23 Additional Farming Advocacy Organizations)(Stokes-Hough, Keisha)
June 21, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to Intervene by Lee Perry. (tlf)
June 21, 2021 Filing 37 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Association of American Indian Farmers, National Black Farmers Association. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Declaration of John Boyd, Jr, #2 Ex 2 - Declaration of Kara Boyd, #3 Ex 3 - Declaration of Ivan Isidore Williams, #4 Ex 4 - Declaration of Shade Marshall Lewis)(tlf)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #24 Unopposed MOTION to file amicus brief in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction, filed by Association of American Indian Farmers and National Black Farmers Association, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 06/21/2021. The Clerk is directed to detach and e-file the amicus brief (Dkt. No. 24-5) as well as the supporting declarations (Dkt. No. 24-1, 24-2, 24-3 & 24-4). (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
June 21, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #35 Response to Motion. All attachments to documents should include a brief description of the attachment - Ex A - Initial Contract, Ex B - Doe Deposition, Ex C - 2006 Sales Figures, etc. This document does not need to be refiled.; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (tlf)
June 18, 2021 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Newton, Emily)
June 18, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Intervene Conditionally and MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Association of American Indian Farmers, National Black Farmers Association. (Attachments: #1 J. Boyd Declaration, #2 K. Boyd Declaration, #3 Williams Declaration, #4 Lewis Declaration, #5 Proposed Answer)(Muraskin, David) Modified on 6/21/2021 (tlf).
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion for Leave to File Response Brief in Excess of 30 Pages, filed by Zach Ducheneaux and Thomas J Vilsack, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 06/15/2021. Defendants' brief in response to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction shall not exceed 40 pages. Plaintiffs' time to file a reply brief is extended to June 23, 2021, and the reply brief shall not exceed 20 pages. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, william)
June 15, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by David S Muraskin on behalf of National Black Farmers Association. Attorney(s) appearing: David S. Muraskin (Muraskin, David)
June 15, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by David S Muraskin on behalf of Association of American Indian Farmers. Attorney(s) appearing: David S. Muraskin (Muraskin, David)
June 15, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L Culpepper on behalf of National Black Farmers Association. Attorney(s) appearing: Jessica L. Culpepper (Culpepper, Jessica)
June 15, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L Culpepper on behalf of Association of American Indian Farmers. Attorney(s) appearing: Jessica L. Culpepper (Culpepper, Jessica)
June 15, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #27 MOTION for Leave to File Response Brief in Excess of 30 Pages . (Lennington, Daniel)
June 14, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Response Brief in Excess of 30 Pages by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snow, Kyla)
June 10, 2021 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE Statement by Association of American Indian Farmers. (Chen, Randolph)
June 10, 2021 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE Statement by National Black Farmers Association. (Chen, Randolph)
June 10, 2021 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Association of American Indian Farmers, National Black Farmers Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Chen, Randolph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2021: #5 Proposed Amicus Brief) (tlf).
June 10, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Randolph Chen on behalf of Association of American Indian Farmers. Attorney(s) appearing: Randolph T. Chen (Chen, Randolph)
June 10, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Randolph Chen on behalf of National Black Farmers Association. Attorney(s) appearing: Randolph T. Chen (Chen, Randolph)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 6/10/2021 granting Plaintiffs' #12 Motion for Temporary restraining order. Defendants are enjoined from forgiving any loans pursuant to Section 1005 until the Court rules on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) (lh).
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 6/10/2021 denying Cory Lea's #6 Motion for joinder. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Cory Lea)(Griesbach, William)
June 9, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Lennington, Daniel)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ORDER The Court will consider any reply brief in support of #12 MOTION for temporary restraining order filed on or before June 10, 2021, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 06/09/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
June 8, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants re #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Government's PI Opposition in Wynn v. Vilsack, #2 Exhibit B - Cobb Declaration)(Newton, Emily)
June 4, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Conference held on 6/4/2021. Brief in opposition to #13 Motion for preliminary injunction due 6/18/2021, reply to be filed over the weekend. The government may file a response to the #12 Motion for temporary restraining order by 6/8/2021. (Tape #060421) (lh)
June 4, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyla Snow on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Kyla Marie Snow (Snow, Kyla)
June 4, 2021 NOTICE by the Court. The Telephone Conference scheduled for TODAY, 6/4/2021 at 3:30 pm has been CONVERTED to an ATT Conference Call. Instructions as follows: Participants are to call in to 1-888-273-3658, using Access Code 4416978, and Security Code 1234. Please be sure to call in prior to the time that the hearing is scheduled to begin so that there is no disruption to the court proceeding. To ensure a clear record of the hearing, participants should not use a speaker phone. Unless otherwise excused, all participants are expected to remain on the call for the duration of the conference. (lh)
June 3, 2021 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 FAUST, #2 Ex 2 BAIRD, #3 Ex 3 SLABA, #4 Ex 4 STEVENS, #5 Ex 5 SCHMITZ, #6 Ex 6 ASH, #7 Ex 7 BOHNENCAMP, #8 Ex 8 WATKINS, #9 Ex 9 BANDUCCI, #10 Ex 10 SHIELDS)(Lennington, Daniel)
June 3, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Lennington, Daniel)
June 3, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Lennington, Daniel)
June 3, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing on #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Telephone conference set for 6/4/2021 03:30 PM before Judge William C Griesbach regarding the procedure for addressing this motion. The court will initiate the call and the parties have provided their telephone numbers for the conference. Any change in telephone contact information should be provided to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(tlf)
May 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Sue Newton on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Emily Sue Newton (Newton, Emily)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian R Larsen on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Chris R. Larsen (Larsen, Christian)
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants re #6 MOTION for Joinder . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Report and Recommendation)(Newton, Emily) Modified exhibit text on 5/26/2021 (lh).
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #6 MOTION for Joinder . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spitz, Katherine)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants adding parties James C Ash, Lori J Watkins, Teena J Banducci, Christopher D Bohnenkamp, Theodore G Shields, Cheryl J Ash, and Brandon D Banducci.(Lennington, Daniel) Modified on 5/20/2021 (tlf).
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Joinder as a Plaintiff and CROSSCLAIM against Plaintiffs Faust, Baird, Stevens, Slaba and Schmitz by Corey Lea. (tlf)
May 4, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Lennington, Daniel)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P Lennington on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Katherine D. Spitz (Lennington, Daniel)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P Lennington on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Luke N. Berg (Lennington, Daniel)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P Lennington on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Richard M. Esenberg (Lennington, Daniel)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jay T. Slaba, Adam P. Faust, Jon Stevens, Christopher C. Baird, Joseph W. Schmitz. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3805205) (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Vilsack, #2 Summons Summons Ducheneaux, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lennington, Daniel)
April 29, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
April 29, 2021 Summons Issued as to Zack Duchaneaux and Thomas J Vilsack. (tlf)
April 29, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint. The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. This document does not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (tlf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faust et al v. Vilsack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam P Faust
Represented By: Daniel P Lennington
Represented By: Richard M Esenberg
Represented By: Katherine D Spitz
Represented By: Luke N Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Stevens
Represented By: Daniel P Lennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph W Schmitz
Represented By: Daniel P Lennington
Represented By: Richard M Esenberg
Represented By: Katherine D Spitz
Represented By: Luke N Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher C Baird
Represented By: Daniel P Lennington
Represented By: Richard M Esenberg
Represented By: Katherine D Spitz
Represented By: Luke N Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay T Slaba
Represented By: Daniel P Lennington
Represented By: Richard M Esenberg
Represented By: Katherine D Spitz
Represented By: Luke N Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore G Shields, Jr
Represented By: Daniel P Lennington
Represented By: Richard M Esenberg
Represented By: Katherine D Spitz
Represented By: Luke N Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl J Ash
Represented By: Daniel P Lennington
Represented By: Richard M Esenberg
Represented By: Katherine D Spitz
Represented By: Luke N Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teena J Banducci
Represented By: Daniel P Lennington
Represented By: Richard M Esenberg
Represented By: Katherine D Spitz
Represented By: Luke N Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori J Watkins
Represented By: Daniel P Lennington
Represented By: Richard M Esenberg
Represented By: Katherine D Spitz
Represented By: Luke N Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon D Banducci
Represented By: Daniel P Lennington
Represented By: Richard M Esenberg
Represented By: Katherine D Spitz
Represented By: Luke N Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan P Stevens
Represented By: Daniel P Lennington
Represented By: Richard M Esenberg
Represented By: Katherine D Spitz
Represented By: Luke N Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C Ash
Represented By: Daniel P Lennington
Represented By: Richard M Esenberg
Represented By: Katherine D Spitz
Represented By: Luke N Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher D Bohnenkamp
Represented By: Daniel P Lennington
Represented By: Richard M Esenberg
Represented By: Katherine D Spitz
Represented By: Luke N Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J Vilsack
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Emily Sue Newton
Represented By: Christian R Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zack Duchaneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Ducheneaux
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Emily Sue Newton
Represented By: Christian R Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Community Farm Alliance
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rural Coalition
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kansas Black Farmers Association
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cottage House Inc
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Intertribal Agriculture Council
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Family Farm Defenders
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Woman Food & Agriculture Network
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Black Farmers Association
Represented By: Jessica L Culpepper
Represented By: Randolph Chen
Represented By: David S Muraskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California FarmLink
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HEAL Food Alliance
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Texas Coalition of Rural Landowners
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Sustainable Agriculture Coalition
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Operation Spring Plant Inc
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Farm Aid
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Family Farm Coalition
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Natural Resources Defense Council Inc
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Latino Farmers and Ranchers Trade Association
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: World Farmers
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Steward Holdings Inc
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rural Advancement Foundation International-USA
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Young Farmers Coalition
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: North Carolina Association of Black Lawyers Land Loss Prevention Project
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oklahoma Black Historical Research Project Inc
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of American Indian Farmers
Represented By: Jessica L Culpepper
Represented By: Randolph Chen
Represented By: David S Muraskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rural Advancement Fund of the National Sharecroppers Fund Inc
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CFA
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Indian Mothers Inc
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Arkansas Land and Farm Development Corporation
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Land Stewardship Project
Represented By: Keisha Stokes-Hough
Represented By: Alexandra M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lee Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Corey Lea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?