CoVantage Credit Union v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: CoVantage Credit Union
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00867
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order UPDATED TELEPHONE INSTRUCTIONS FOR 9/20/21 TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE. Instructions: Participants are to call in to 1-888-273-3658, using Access Code 4416978, and Security Code 1234. (mac)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #24 Rule 7(h) MOTION for hearing, signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 09/17/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/20/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge William C Griesbach. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred). Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(mac)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Hearing (Status Conference) by CoVantage Credit Union. (Cirincione, James)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 9/16/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION for Entry of Protective Order by CoVantage Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Scobie, Rachel)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 9/1/2021 before Judge William Griesbach Court Reporter/Transcriber John Schindhelm, Contact at www.johnschindhelm.com to order directly... OR. Transcripts may be purchased using the Transcript Order Form found #on our website or viewed at the court public terminal. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: If necessary, within 7 business days each party shall inform the Court of their intent to redact personal identifiers by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact. Please read the policy located on our website # www.wied.uscourts.gov Redaction Statement due 10/4/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2021. (Schindhelm, John)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Conference held on 9/1/2021. Plaintiff's #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is held in abeyance pending an issued decision on Defendant's #16 Motion to Dismiss. (Tape #090121) (mac)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DISCLOSURE Statement by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company. (Schmidt, T)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION of Liz Irick in Support of Specially Appearing Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schmidt, T)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 BRIEF in Support filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Schmidt, T)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company. (Schmidt, T)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Raimer on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Anna Raimer (Raimer, Anna)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Wilkes on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Meredith M. Wilkes (Wilkes, Meredith)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James F Cirincione on behalf of CoVantage Credit Union. Attorney(s) appearing: James F. Cirincione (Cirincione, James)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Telephone Status/Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2021 11:00 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Instructions: Participants are to call in to 1-888-273-3658, using Access Code 4416978, and Security Code 1234. Please be sure to call in prior to the time that the hearing is scheduled to begin so that there is no disruption to the court proceeding. To ensure a clear record of the hearing, participants should not use a speaker phone. Unless otherwise excused, all participants are expected to remain on the call for the duration of the conference. Please contact the Office of the Clerk at 920-455-7381 if you have any questions. All participants are to confirm their appearance with the Clerk prior to the date of the hearing. Verification of your participation should be sent to wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: Plaintiff's counsel and via email to Defendant's counsel)(tlf)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #10 Declaration and #11 Declaration. All attachments to documents should include a brief description of the attachment - Ex A - Initial Contract, Ex B - Doe Deposition, Ex C - 2006 Sales Figures, etc. This document does not need to be refiled. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (tlf)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CoVantage Credit Union (Scobie, Rachel)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION of Sherry Aulik (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Scobie, Rachel)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION of Rachel Zimmerman Scobie (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Scobie, Rachel)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BRIEF in Support filed by CoVantage Credit Union re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Scobie, Rachel)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CoVantage Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scobie, Rachel)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CoVantage Credit Union. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company served on 8/10/2021. (Scobie, Rachel)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by CoVantage Credit Union. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Scobie, Rachel)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Zimmerman Scobie on behalf of CoVantage Credit Union. Attorney(s) appearing: Rachel Scobie (Scobie, Rachel)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (tlf)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Adelson on behalf of CoVantage Credit Union. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeremy Adelson (Adelson, Jeremy)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by CoVantage Credit Union. (Hansen, Timothy)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company by CoVantage Credit Union. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3876989) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - TSDR Report for CoVantage Credit Union, #2 Exhibit B - TSDR Report for Covantage Cares, #3 Exhibit C - TSDR Report for the mark Blue Shield, #4 Exhibit D - TSDR Report for the mark Blue Cross, #5 Exhibit E - Declarations of Use for Registration Nos. 3,288,737 and 3,288,738, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Hansen, Timothy)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company. (tlf)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CoVantage Credit Union v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CoVantage Credit Union
Represented By: Jeremy Adelson
Represented By: Rachel Zimmerman Scobie
Represented By: Timothy M Hansen
Represented By: James F Cirincione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Anna Raimer
Represented By: Meredith Wilkes
Represented By: T Wickham Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?