Messer v. Langlade County Child Protective Services et al
Plaintiff: Luke C Messer
Defendant: Langlade County Child Protective Services, Rylee Bricko, Ann Albrecht, Levi Berski, Antigo Police Department and Levi Barske
Case Number: 1:2022cv00208
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by Ann Albrecht, Rylee Bricko, Langlade County Child Protective Services. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Heberling, Cecilia)
April 12, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2022 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 5/6/2022. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event the parties are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and the parties may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel and via U.S. Mail to pro se plaintiff)(Griesbach, William)
April 12, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Antigo Police Department, Levi Barske. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Williams, Brian)
March 30, 2022 Filing 21 US Marshal 285 Forms received for Antigo Police Department and Levi Barske (Attachments: #1 USM 285 form for Levi Barske incorrectly names as Levi Berski)(lh)
March 30, 2022 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Levi Barske - Waiver sent on 2/28/2022. (incorrectly named in complaint as Levi Berski)(lh)
March 30, 2022 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Antigo Police Department - Waiver sent on 2/28/2022. (lh)
March 30, 2022 Filing 18 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Antigo Police Department, Levi Barski. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Williams, Brian)
March 30, 2022 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C Williams on behalf of Antigo Police Department, Levi Barski. Attorney(s) appearing: Brian C. Williams (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Williams, Brian) Modified on 3/30/2022 attorney filed to correct spelling to Barske(lh).
March 30, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C Williams on behalf of Antigo Police Department, Levi Berski. Attorney(s) appearing: Brian C. Williams (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Williams, Brian)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 3/16/2022 Denying #12 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(Griesbach, William)
March 10, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ann Albrecht, Rylee Bricko, Langlade County Child Protective Services of Notice of Appearance (Heberling, Cecilia)
March 10, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cecilia Heberling on behalf of Ann Albrecht, Rylee Bricko, Langlade County Child Protective Services. Attorney(s) appearing: Cecilia A. Heberling (Heberling, Cecilia)
March 10, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Luke C Messer. (Attachments: #1 Emails from Attorneys)(lh)
March 4, 2022 Filing 11 US Marshal 285 Forms as to Langlade County Child Protective Services, Rylee Bricko and Ann Albrecht. (tlf)
March 4, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rylee Bricko - Waiver sent on 2/28/2022. (Lubinsky, Lori)
March 4, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ann Albrecht - Waiver sent on 2/28/2022. (Lubinsky, Lori)
March 4, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Langlade County Child Protective Services - Waiver sent on 2/28/2022. (Lubinsky, Lori)
March 4, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori M Lubinsky on behalf of Ann Albrecht, Rylee Bricko, Langlade County Child Protective Services. Attorney(s) appearing: Lori M. Lubinsky (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lubinsky, Lori)
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Luke C Messer. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 TRANSMIT Complaint, Order, Notice, Waiver, Magistrate form to USM for service upon all defendants. (lh)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by Luke C Messer signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 2/23/22. The US Marshal shall serve a copy of the Complaint and this Order upon Defendants. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(Griesbach, William)
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Luke Messer re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (lh)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Luke C Messer. (lh)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Luke C Messer. Jury Demand (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Messer v. Langlade County Child Protective Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke C Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Langlade County Child Protective Services
Represented By: Cecilia Heberling
Represented By: Lori M Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rylee Bricko
Represented By: Cecilia Heberling
Represented By: Lori M Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Albrecht
Represented By: Cecilia Heberling
Represented By: Lori M Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levi Berski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antigo Police Department
Represented By: Brian C Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levi Barske
Represented By: Brian C Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?