City Gas Company v. Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: City Gas Company
Defendant: TIG Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Ranger Insurance Company and Aetna Casualty and Surety Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00311
Filed: March 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 4/28/2022. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
April 28, 2022 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 4/28/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 5/24/2022, Discovery due by 12/15/2023, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 6/5/2023, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 8/7/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 2/5/2024, Initial Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 5/16/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/21/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. Jury Trial set for 7/22/2024 08:30 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #042822) (lh)
April 21, 2022 Filing 25 Joint Pretrial REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by City Gas Company. (Sullivan, Sheila)
April 11, 2022 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference rescheduled to 4/28/2022 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Instructions: Participants are to call in to 1-888-273-3658, using Access Code 4416978, and Security Code 1234. Please be sure to call in prior to the time that the hearing is scheduled to begin so that there is no disruption to the court proceeding. To ensure a clear record of the hearing, participants should not use a speaker phone. Unless otherwise excused, all participants are expected to remain on the call for the duration of the conference. Please contact the Office of the Clerk at 920-455-7381 if you have any questions. All participants are to confirm their appearance with the Clerk prior to the date of the hearing. Verification of your participation should be sent to wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(tlf)
April 6, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Ferguson on behalf of Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Thomas D. Ferguson (Ferguson, Thomas)
April 6, 2022 DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR. NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference RESCHEDULED to 4/19/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge William C Griesbach. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel) (mac) Modified on 4/6/2022 (mac).
April 6, 2022 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference Rescheduled to 4/18/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(mac)
March 24, 2022 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative and Other Defenses by TIG Insurance Company.(Cohen, Michael)
March 24, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company.(Economou, Dena)
March 24, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Reliance Upon Jury Demand by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company.(Ruggirello, Nicole)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #18 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to March 24, 2022 to Answer or otherwise respond, filed by TIG Insurance Company, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 03/16/2022. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 15, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren B McMillen on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Lauren B. McMillen (McMillen, Lauren)
March 15, 2022 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by TIG Insurance Company. (Cohen, Michael)
March 15, 2022 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by TIG Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cohen, Michael)
March 14, 2022 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Weiss, Monte)
March 14, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C Newa on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Kenneth C. Newa (Newa, Kenneth)
March 14, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Ruggirello on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Nicole C. Ruggirello (Ruggirello, Nicole)
March 14, 2022 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by City Gas Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Sullivan, Sheila)
March 14, 2022 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE Statement by City Gas Company. (Sullivan, Sheila)
March 11, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2022 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 4/15/2022. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 11, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James M Sosnoski on behalf of TIG Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: James M. Sosnoski (Sosnoski, James)
March 11, 2022 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by TIG Insurance Company. (Cohen, Michael)
March 11, 2022 Filing 8 JOINDER by TIG Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Cohen, Michael)
March 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Cohen on behalf of TIG Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael J. Cohen (Cohen, Michael)
March 11, 2022 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Notice of Removal. The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. Most documents on the drop-down list do not need further description. If you want to add a description, do not retype the same words into the description box. For example, if you choose Summons from the drop-down list then you may use the description box to the type in the name of the party to whom the summons is directed but you do not need to type the word summons. This document does not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (tlf)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company. (Weiss, Monte)
March 10, 2022 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. (Block, Drew)
March 10, 2022 Filing 4 JOINDER by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company re #1 Notice of Removal, and Notice of Consent. (Block, Drew)
March 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew L Block on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Drew L. Block (Block, Drew)
March 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Dena Economou on behalf of Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Dena Economou (Economou, Dena)
March 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company from Langlade Circuit Court, Case Number: 2022CV00021 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4060817) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint State Court Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service on Hartford)(Weiss, Monte)
March 10, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City Gas Company v. Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIG Insurance Company
Represented By: James M Sosnoski
Represented By: Michael J Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Represented By: Drew L Block
Represented By: Kenneth C Newa
Represented By: Lauren B McMillen
Represented By: Nicole Ruggirello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company
Represented By: Dena Economou
Represented By: Monte E Weiss
Represented By: Thomas Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranger Insurance Company
Represented By: James M Sosnoski
Represented By: Michael J Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Casualty and Surety Company
Represented By: Drew L Block
Represented By: Kenneth C Newa
Represented By: Lauren B McMillen
Represented By: Nicole Ruggirello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Gas Company
Represented By: David E McFarlane
Represented By: Sheila M Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?