The Estate of June Martineau, et al v. Country Villa Assisted Living in Pulaski Inc, et al
Plaintiff: Peter Martineau, Thomas Martineau, Rick Martineau, The Estate of June Martineau, State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services and United Healthcare of Wisconsin Inc
Defendant: Country Villa Assisted Living in Pulaski, Inc, Country Villa Assisted Living, Inc, Country Villa Assisted Living in Pulaski Inc doing business as Country Villa Assisted Living Pulaski doing business as Country Villa Assisted Living LLC doing business as Country Villa Assisted Living, Country Villa Assisted Living Inc doing business as Country Villa Assisted Living Pulaski doing business as Country Villa Assisted Living LLC doing business as Country Villa Assisted Living, ABC Insurance Companies and DEF Insurance Companies
Case Number: 1:2022cv00402
Filed: March 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #13 MOTION to Remand . (Metzger, Katherine)
May 25, 2022 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #18 MOTION to Dismiss DHS filed by State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services ; Certain attachments (AFFIDAVIT) to this document should have been filed as separate entries. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
May 25, 2022 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #19 MOTION for Order Proposed Order filed by State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services ; This document should have been filed as an attachment to the Motion. This document does not need to be re-filed. Also, the incorrect event was chosen, the document filed was a Proposed Order not a Motion; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
May 24, 2022 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER filed by State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. (Welch, Allison) Modified event text and termed motion on 5/25/2022 (lh).
May 24, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss DHS by State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Allison M. Welch, #2 Certificate of Service)(Welch, Allison)
May 24, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison M Welch on behalf of State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. Attorney(s) appearing: Allison M. Welch (Welch, Allison)
May 18, 2022 Filing 16 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Country Villa Assisted Living Inc, Country Villa Assisted Living in Pulaski Inc re #13 MOTION to Remand . (Budzinski, Mark)
May 11, 2022 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Country Villa Assisted Living Inc, Country Villa Assisted Living in Pulaski Inc re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (Budzinski, Mark)
April 27, 2022 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #13 MOTION to Remand . (Metzger, Katherine)
April 27, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Metzger, Katherine)
April 27, 2022 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (Metzger, Katherine)
April 27, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (Metzger, Katherine)
April 20, 2022 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Metzger, Katherine)
April 19, 2022 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Country Villa Assisted Living Inc, Country Villa Assisted Living in Pulaski Inc. (Budzinski, Mark)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER ADJOURNING the April 25, 2022 Rule 16 telephone scheduling conference, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 04/19/2022. Briefing on #5 Defendants' motion to dismiss shall follow the briefing schedule set forth in the Local Rules of the Eastern District of Wisconsin. The Rule 16(b) telephone scheduling conference will be rescheduled, if necessary, once the Court issues a decision on the motion to dismiss. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
April 6, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of David J. Pliner In Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Docket for US Dist. Court Western District of Louisiana Case No. 21CV334)(Budzinski, Mark)
April 6, 2022 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support filed by Country Villa Assisted Living Inc, Country Villa Assisted Living in Pulaski Inc re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (Budzinski, Mark)
April 6, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Country Villa Assisted Living Inc, Country Villa Assisted Living in Pulaski Inc. (Budzinski, Mark)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa N Chojnacki on behalf of Country Villa Assisted Living Inc, Country Villa Assisted Living in Pulaski Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Alyssa N Chojnacki (Chojnacki, Alyssa)
April 1, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Country Villa Assisted Living Inc, Country Villa Assisted Living in Pulaski Inc. (Budzinski, Mark)
April 1, 2022 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference RESCHEDULED to 4/25/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 4/18/2022. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(mac)
March 31, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2022 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 4/29/2022. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 31, 2022 Case Opening Modification(s). The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: All party names have been modified to remove punctuation and addresses. Additional party names have been added for plaintiff, involuntary plaintiffs and Doe defendants. Alias names have been added for named defendants. Please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. The notice of removal entry has been modified to remove duplicate documents and to attach documents in the proper order. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (tlf)
March 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Country Villa Assisted Living in Pulaski, Inc, Country Villa Assisted Living, Inc from Brown County Circuit Court, Case Number: 22CV156 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4076784) (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Circuit Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Ex. B - Dept. Health & Human Services Opinion Letter, #3 Ex. C - Affidavit of Chad Reade, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Budzinski, Mark) Modified on 3/31/2022 (tlf).
March 30, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of June Martineau, et al v. Country Villa Assisted Living in Pulaski Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Martineau
Represented By: Katherine E Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Martineau
Represented By: Katherine E Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Martineau
Represented By: Katherine E Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of June Martineau
Represented By: Katherine E Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Represented By: Allison M Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Healthcare of Wisconsin Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Villa Assisted Living in Pulaski, Inc
Represented By: Mark T Budzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Villa Assisted Living, Inc
Represented By: Mark T Budzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Villa Assisted Living in Pulaski Inc doing business as Country Villa Assisted Living Pulaski doing business as Country Villa Assisted Living LLC doing business as Country Villa Assisted Living
Represented By: Alyssa N Chojnacki
Represented By: Mark T Budzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Villa Assisted Living Inc doing business as Country Villa Assisted Living Pulaski doing business as Country Villa Assisted Living LLC doing business as Country Villa Assisted Living
Represented By: Alyssa N Chojnacki
Represented By: Mark T Budzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?