Van Linn v. Oconto County et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Van Linn
Defendant: Oconto County and Nicholas School
Case Number: 1:2022cv00434
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2022 10:00 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 7/5/2022. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
June 2, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Smith, Andrew)
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Smith, Andrew)
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Defendants. (Smith, Andrew)
May 9, 2022 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Smith, Andrew)
May 9, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P Smith on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew Smith (Smith, Andrew)
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Daniel Van Linn. (Bradley, John)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Daniel Van Linn. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Bradley, John)
April 8, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Daniel Van Linn. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4084431) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bradley, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Linn v. Oconto County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Van Linn
Represented By: John H Bradley
Represented By: Randal Richard Resch, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oconto County
Represented By: Andrew P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas School
Represented By: Andrew P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?