Gabriel et al v. Reid et al
Plaintiff: Joshua P Gabriel and Rhienna Gabriel
Defendant: Brandon Reid and Nick Reimer
Case Number: 1:2022cv00452
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ORDER DENYING #17 Motion to Remove Sealed Document (10-1) from Record filed by Rhienna Gabriel, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 06/07/2022. Dkt. No. (10-1) is a memorandum in support of a motion which the Court relied upon in issuing an order. The Court removed the sealed designation from the document on 5/27/2022 and Plaintiff has not demonstrated good cause for its removal from the docket. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Rhienna Gabriel, pro se)(Griesbach, William)
June 6, 2022 Filing 19 TRANSMIT Amended Complaint, Notice, Waiver, Magistrate Form to US Marshals for service upon Defendants Reid and Reimer. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Reid) (lh)
June 6, 2022 Filing 18 Proof of Service of Certified Mailing by Rhienna Gabriel (mac)
June 6, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Remove Sealed Document from Record by Rhienna Gabriel. (mac)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR SERVICE signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 6/3/2022. Plaintiff's second #15 amended complaint and #14 supplement are deemed inoperative. The operative complaint is the Amended Pro Se Complaint filed on 4/26/22 as Docket No #5 . The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve such complaint with appropriate summons on Manitowoc Co. Detective Brandon Reid and Manitowoc Police Chief Nick Reimer. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(Griesbach, William)
May 31, 2022 Filing 15 PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants filed by Rhienna Gabriel.(tlf)
May 31, 2022 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT by Rhienna Gabriel re #5 Amended Complaint. (lh)
May 27, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Order for Service by Rhienna Gabriel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cav)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying MOTION to Amend/Correct Court Order filed by Rhienna Gabriel. Furthermore, for lack of good cause shown, the Clerk is directed to remove the sealed designation from Plaintiffs supporting memorandum (Dkt. No. 10-1) and denying #11 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Rhienna Gabriel. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(Griesbach, William)
May 24, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Protective Order by Rhienna Gabriel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cav)
May 24, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend Court Order by Rhienna Gabriel. #1 Memo in Support of Amending Order #2 Cover Letter) (cav). Modified on 5/27/2022 to unseal attachment #10 -1 Memo pursuant to #12 Order (cav).
May 20, 2022 Filing 9 Pro Se Service packet mailed to plaintiffs. (tlf)
May 17, 2022 FILING FEE Received: $402.00, receipt number 5965. (tlf)
May 13, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER from the Clerk to Rhienna Gabriel regarding incorrect filing fee payment and completion of the magistrate judge jurisdiction form. Plaintiff is to resubmit the correct filing fee on or before 5/25/2022. (cc: All Counsel) (tlf)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 5/11/2022. Plaintiffs request to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, Plaintiffs shall either pay the full filing fee or file a request to proceed in district court without prepaying the filing fee. It is further ordered that, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, Plaintiff Joshua P. Gabriel shall submit a signed copy of the amended complaint. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(Griesbach, William)
April 27, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER from the Clerk to Joshua P Gabriel directing him to submit a signed copy of the #5 Amended Pro Se Complaint on or before 5/6/2022. (cc: All Counsel) (tlf)
April 26, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED PRO SE COMPLAINT against Brandon Reid, Nick Reimer filed by Joshua P Gabriel, Rhienna Gabriel.(cmb) (Note: Amended Complaint is not signed by Joshua P Gabriel)(tlf).
April 15, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER from the Clerk to Joshua P Gabriel directing him to submit a signed copy of the #1 Complaint within 21 days. (tlf)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiffs re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting payment of the full filing fee or that a petition to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee be filed within 21 days. Mailed. (cmb)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 ENVELOPE with PO Box address. (cmb)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joshua P Gabriel, Rhienna Gabriel. (Note: Complaint is not signed by Joshua P Gabriel) (cmb) Modified on 4/15/2022 (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriel et al v. Reid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua P Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhienna Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?