Laine et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Donald M. Laine, Mr. Alex Azar, UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc, Erie Insurance Company, Donald M Laine and Xavier Becerra
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Ms. Connnie Schueller and Connie Schueller
Case Number: 1:2022cv00592
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Richer on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Gino M. Alia (Richer, Matthew)
July 15, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Richer, Matthew)
July 15, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Richer on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew J. Richer (Richer, Matthew)
July 13, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald M Laine. Xavier Becerra served on 7/6/2022 c/o US Attorney's Office. (tlf)
July 13, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald M Laine. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 7/7/2022. (tlf)
July 13, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald M Laine. Erie Insurance Company served on 7/7/2022. (tlf)
July 13, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald M Laine. UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc served on 7/7/2022. (tlf)
July 13, 2022 Filing 7 Incorrect event; Document refiled. AFFIDAVIT of Sara Conrad of service on Sec. Dept. Health. (DeVinney, Drew) Modified on 7/13/2022 (tlf).
July 13, 2022 Filing 6 Incorrect event; Document refiled. AFFIDAVIT of Shawn Conrad of service on State Farm. (DeVinney, Drew) Modified on 7/13/2022 (tlf).
July 13, 2022 Filing 5 Incorrect event; Document refiled. AFFIDAVIT of Shawn Conrad of service on Erie Ins.. (DeVinney, Drew) Modified on 7/13/2022 (tlf).
July 13, 2022 Filing 4 Incorrect Event; Document refiled. AFFIDAVIT of Shawn Conrad of service on United Health Care. (DeVinney, Drew) Modified on 7/13/2022 (tlf).
May 19, 2022 Summons Issued as to Xavier Becerra, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tlf)
May 19, 2022 Summons Issued as to Erie Insurance Company, Connie Schueller, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc. (tlf)
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (DeVinney, Drew)
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (DeVinney, Drew)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Donald M. Laine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Secretary of Dept. of Health & Human Services, #3 Summons UnitedHealthCare of Wisconsin, #4 Summons Erie Insurance Company, #5 Summons State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, #6 Summons Connie Schueller)(DeVinney, Drew)
May 18, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (bx)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laine et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald M. Laine
Represented By: Drew J DeVinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erie Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald M Laine
Represented By: Drew J DeVinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Richer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Connnie Schueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Schueller
Represented By: Matthew J Richer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?