Jaeger v. Jaeger
Plaintiff: Harold Eugene Jaeger
Defendant: Harold William Jaeger
Case Number: 1:2022cv01114
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Filing 16 LETTER from Atty. John T. Schomisch, Jr. . (Schomisch, John)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 11/8/2022. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
November 4, 2022 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 11/4/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2022, Discovery due by 8/27/2023, Party with burden of proof Expert Witness List due by 1/25/2023, Responsive Party Expert Witness List due by 3/26/2023, Motions due by 9/27/2023, Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/28/2022. (Tape #110422) (cav) .
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #12 Plaintiff's Letter request to appear at the Rule 16 Conference via telephone, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 11/01/2022. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 28, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER from Atty. John T. Schomisch, Jr. and REQUEST to appear by telephone for Scheduling Conference. (Schomisch, John) Modified text and removed restriction on 10/31/2022 (lh).
October 28, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Laina Petersen Stuebner on behalf of Harold William Jaeger. Attorney(s) appearing: Laina P. Stuebner (Stuebner, Laina)
October 28, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Counsel for plaintiff is required to appear in person in Courtroom 201 at 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301. Counsel for defendant may appear by telephone and shall provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the scheduling conference. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel) (kwf)
October 27, 2022 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Conference held on 10/27/2022. Plaintiff's counsel was unavailable at the telephone number that was provided to the Court. The Court will reschedule the Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference. Plaintiff's counsel is required to appear in person at the time of the rescheduled conference. (kwf)
October 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John T Schomisch, Jr on behalf of Harold Eugene Jaeger. Attorney(s) appearing: John T. Schomisch, Jr. (Schomisch, John)
October 20, 2022 Filing 8 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Harold William Jaeger. (Weber, David)
October 12, 2022 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing as to TIME ONLY: The Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2022 is RESCHEDULED to start at 09:20 AM by Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Atty. Winter)(lh)
October 4, 2022 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #7 Answer to Complaint filed by Harold William Jaeger ; The incorrect case number appears on the document. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (mac)
October 3, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Harold William Jaeger.(Weber, David) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/4/2022 to include correct case caption) (mac).
September 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2022 09:40 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(lh) (Main Document 6 replaced and text modified on 9/27/2022 to correct Hearing Date typo) (lh).
September 26, 2022 Copy of Notice of Hearing #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Attorney Michael B Winter (lh) Re-issued via US mail to Mr. Winter with Date Typo corrected on 9/27/2022 (lh).
September 23, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Harold William Jaeger. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Weber, David)
September 23, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Affidavit of Mailing . (Weber, David)
September 23, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER to Michael B Winter regarding Admission and ECF registration (jcl)
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Harold William Jaeger. (Weber, David)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Harold William Jaeger from Forest, Case Number: 22CV62 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4218341) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Motion and Motion for Injunction, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Harold E. Jaeger, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weber, David)
September 23, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaeger v. Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Eugene Jaeger
Represented By: Michael B Winter
Represented By: John T Schomisch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold William Jaeger
Represented By: David H Weber
Represented By: Laina Petersen Stuebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?