Wydeven v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Richard J Wydeven
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2022cv01163
Filed: October 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C Hugo on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. Attorney(s) appearing: Megan C. Hugo (Hugo, Megan)
October 24, 2022 Filing 8 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by December 23, 2022;Plaintiff's brief due February 1, 2023;Defendant's response due March 13, 2023;Plaintiff's reply due March 28, 2023. (cc: all counsel) (blr)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/24/2022. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
October 21, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Richard J Wydeven. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Marvin, Cody)
October 20, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/18/2022; GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel)(bx)
October 18, 2022 SERVICE OF COMPLAINT - Pursuant to the #Eastern District of Wisconsin's Memorandum of Understanding, the Commissioner and U.S. Attorney's Office have been electronically served with the Social Security appeal via CM/ECF. NOTICE to Plaintiff - Service on the Commissioner in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the Commissioner requests otherwise. (blr)
October 3, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Richard J. Wydeven. (Marvin, Cody)
October 3, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Richard J. Wydeven. (Marvin, Cody)
October 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi by Richard J. Wydeven. (Attachments: #1 AC Decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marvin, Cody)
October 3, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wydeven v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J Wydeven
Represented By: Cody T Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Megan C Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?