Hilgen v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Hilgen
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2022cv01424
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lu Han on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. Attorney(s) appearing: Lu Han (Han, Lu)
December 12, 2022 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 2/6/2023 (cc: all counsel) (mac)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 12/6/2022 Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
December 6, 2022 SERVICE OF COMPLAINT - Pursuant to the #Eastern District of Wisconsin's Memorandum of Understanding, the Commissioner and U.S. Attorney's Office have been electronically served with the Social Security appeal via CM/ECF. NOTICE to Plaintiff - Service on the Commissioner in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the Commissioner requests otherwise. (mac)
November 30, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Geoffrey Hilgen. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Duncan, Dana)
November 30, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Geoffrey Hilgen. (Duncan, Dana)
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Geoffrey Hilgen. (Duncan, Dana)
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Geoffrey Hilgen (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duncan, Dana)
November 30, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilgen v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Hilgen
Represented By: Dana W Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Lu Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?