Perry v. Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Curtis Perry
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00179
Filed: February 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2023 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/14/2023. The court approves Attorney Thomas Burt as lead class counsel for Plaintiffs and Attorney Shpetim Ademi as lead local counsel for Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs consolidated amended complaint due by 5/15/2023. (Tape #031423 Zoom) Associated Cases: 2:23-md-03064-WCG et al.(mac)
March 14, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Shpetim Ademi on behalf of Jacqueline Assise, Robert Assise. Attorney(s) appearing: Shpetim Ademi Associated Cases: 2:23-md-03064-WCG et al.(Ademi, Shpetim)
March 14, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Carter on behalf of Curtis Perry. Attorney(s) appearing: Anthony M. Carter Associated Cases: 2:23-md-03064-WCG, 1:23-cv-00179-WCG(Carter, Anthony)
March 14, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Tostrud on behalf of Curtis Perry. Attorney(s) appearing: Jon A. Tostrud Associated Cases: 2:23-md-03064-WCG, 1:23-cv-00179-WCG(Tostrud, Jon)
March 14, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Albert on behalf of Curtis Perry. Attorney(s) appearing: Lee Albert Associated Cases: 2:23-md-03064-WCG, 1:23-cv-00179-WCG(Albert, Lee)
March 3, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 3/14/2023 at 03:00 PM (CT) in by Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. The parties shall call the courts Zoom conference line at 669-254-5252 and use Meeting ID: 161 5758 9308 and Passcode: 519855 to join the call. To ensure a clear record of the hearing, participants should not use a speaker phone. Participants shall call in prior to the time that the hearing is scheduled to begin so that there is no disruption to the court proceeding. If you have any questions, please contact the Clerks Office at 920-455-7381. (cc: all counsel)Associated Cases: 2:23-md-03064-WCG et al.(lh) Modified on 3/3/2023 to note Central Time Zone(lh).
February 27, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L Spector on behalf of Curtis Perry. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey L. Spector Associated Cases: 2:23-md-03064-WCG, 1:23-cv-00179-WCG(Spector, Jeffrey)
February 17, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by William G B Caldes on behalf of Curtis Perry, Curtis Perry. Attorney(s) appearing: William G. Caldes Associated Cases: 2:23-md-03064-WCG, 1:23-cv-00179-WCG(Caldes, William) Modified per phone call on 2/21/2023 (kah).
February 16, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard B Iwrey on behalf of Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Howard B. Iwrey (Iwrey, Howard)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 2/15/23 that by 3/03/23, counsel shall confer and submit three dates on or after 3/09/23, on which the primary attorney for the defendant and for each of the plaintiffs are available for a telephonic initial status hearing; counsel for plaintiffs shall confer re: selection of lead and liaison counsel and if no agreement is reached, counsel for each plaintiff shall file a status report regarding the selection no later than three days before the status conferenceAssociated Cases: 2:23-md-03064-WCG et al. (cc: all counsel)(vkb)
February 13, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach (jcl)
February 9, 2023 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-02920. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 9, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge William C. Griesbach.(kt) [Transferred from mnd on 2/9/2023.]
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #8 Joint Stipulation Regarding Waiver of Service and Stay of Proceedings. See Order for details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/4/2023. (KLN) [Transferred from mnd on 2/9/2023.]
December 27, 2022 Filing 10 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Howard B. Iwrey and Cody D. Rockey as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP) [Transferred from mnd on 2/9/2023.]
December 27, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Blanchfield, Garrett) [Transferred from mnd on 2/9/2023.]
December 27, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION Regarding Waiver of Service and Stay of Proceedings by Curtis Perry. Jointly Signed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, Inc.. (Blanchfield, Garrett) [Transferred from mnd on 2/9/2023.]
December 9, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mickey L Stevens on behalf of Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. (Stevens, Mickey) [Transferred from mnd on 2/9/2023.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) [Transferred from mnd on 2/9/2023.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Brian Murray, Lee Albert, Brian Brooks, Jon A. Tostrud, William G. Caldes, Jeffrey L. Spector, Icee N. Etheridge as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MKB) [Transferred from mnd on 2/9/2023.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. (MKB) [Transferred from mnd on 2/9/2023.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per (3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-2920 (WMW/TNL).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB) [Transferred from mnd on 2/9/2023.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, filed by Curtis Perry. (Blanchfield, Garrett) Modified text on 11/17/2022 (MKB). [Transferred from mnd on 2/9/2023.]
November 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9895546) filed by Curtis Perry. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, # FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. (2) Civil Cover Sheet) (Blanchfield, Garrett) Modified text on 11/17/2022 (MKB). [Transferred from mnd on 2/9/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Perry
Represented By: Brant D Penney
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: William G Caldes
Represented By: Anthony Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group LLC
Represented By: Michael R Carey
Represented By: Mickey L Stevens
Represented By: Howard B Iwrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?