Krause Brokerage Services LLC v. American Century Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Krause Brokerage Services, LLC and Krause Brokerage Services LLC
Defendant: American Century Life Insurance Company and American Century Life Insurance Company of Texas
Case Number: 1:2023cv01574
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James F Cirincione on behalf of American Century Life Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: James Cirincione (Cirincione, James)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 1/4/2024. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
January 3, 2024 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 1/3/2024. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 1/19/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2024, Discovery due by 9/30/2024, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 4/12/2024, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 6/14/2024, Rebuttal Expert Witness List due by 7/19/2024, Motions due by 10/31/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach, Jury Trial set for 4/14/2025 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #Zoom 010324) (mac)
December 21, 2023 Filing 8 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Krause Brokerage Services LLC. (Fisher, Matthew)
December 14, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by American Century Life Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hansen, Timothy)
December 13, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Fisher, Matthew)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Krause Brokerage Services LLC. (Fisher, Matthew)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Century Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agent Contract)(Hansen, Timothy)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2024 at 9:00 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 12/27/2023. The parties shall call the court's Zoom conference line at 669-254-5252, use Meeting ID: 161 5758 9308, press # to bypass Participant ID, and enter Passcode: 519855 to join the call. To ensure a clear record of the hearing, participants should not use a speaker phone. Participants shall call in prior to the time that the hearing is scheduled to begin so that there is no disruption to the court proceeding. If you have any questions, please contact the Clerk's Office at 920-455-7381. (cc: all counsel) (kwf)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by American Century Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansen, Timothy)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Century Life Insurance Company from Brown County Circuit Court, Case Number: 23-CV-1421 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4547200) (Attachments: #1 Complaint Complaint and Exhibit A)(Hansen, Timothy)
November 22, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (bx)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krause Brokerage Services LLC v. American Century Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krause Brokerage Services, LLC
Represented By: Carly Gerads
Represented By: Matthew V Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krause Brokerage Services LLC
Represented By: Carly Gerads
Represented By: Matthew V Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Century Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy M Hansen
Represented By: James F Cirincione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Century Life Insurance Company of Texas
Represented By: James F Cirincione
Represented By: Timothy M Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?