Flowers v. Tower Pallet Company Inc
Plaintiff: George Flowers
Defendant: Tower Pallet Company Inc
Case Number: 1:2024cv00465
Filed: April 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Filing 7 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk approved by Judge William C Griesbach on 5/31/24. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(lh)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 5/31/24. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff may file a new action should he be able to cure the deficiencies the court has now, on two occasions, brought to his attention. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(Griesbach, William)
May 28, 2024 Filing 5 RESPONSE filed by George Flowers re #3 Screening Order. (Attachments: #1 Bookmarked Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (kwf)
May 6, 2024 Copy of #3 Screening Order, Amended Complaint Form, and prisoner guide re-mailed to Plaintiff on 5/6/2024. Documents were originally mailed to the wrong Plaintiff and returned to the court as undeliverable. (mac)
April 29, 2024 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by George Flowers. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kwf)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 4/24/24. Plaintiff's #2 MOTION for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is GRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint submitted on 4/19/24, is DISMISSED. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint that complies with the requirements of Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on or before 5/24/24. If Plaintiff fails to do so, the action will be dismissed. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party with form and guide)(Griesbach, William)
April 19, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by George Flowers. (jmk)
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Tower Pallet Company Inc filed by George Flowers. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Bookmarked Attachments) (jmk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. Tower Pallet Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower Pallet Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?