Davis v. Lutheran Social Services et al
Plaintiff: Clara Marie Davis
Defendant: Lutheran Social Services, Brenda Hoeper, Sara Sanderson, Laurie Lausard, Holly Wruck and Andrea Proctor
Case Number: 1:2024cv00479
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lutheran Social Services (McCann, Kayla)
June 20, 2024 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Lutheran Social Services. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (McCann, Kayla)
June 20, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lutheran Social Services (McCann, Kayla)
June 20, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lutheran Social Services - Waiver sent on 5/20/2024. (McCann, Kayla)
June 20, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kayla A McCann on behalf of Lutheran Social Services. Attorney(s) appearing: Kayla McCann (McCann, Kayla)
June 20, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany C McCurdy on behalf of Lutheran Social Services. Attorney(s) appearing: Bethany C. McCurdy (McCurdy, Bethany)
May 20, 2024 Filing 8 TRANSMIT Order, Amended Complaint, Notice, Waiver and Magistrate Form to US Marshals for service upon defendant Lutheran Social Services. (jmk) Modified to add defendant name on 5/20/2024 (lh).
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 5/20/2024. The United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the Amended Complaint and this Order upon Defendant Lutheran Social Services pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. Lutheran Social Services shall file a responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint within the time allowed under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party) (Griesbach, William)
May 16, 2024 Party Andrea Proctor, Sara Sanderson, Holly Wruck, Brenda Hoeper and Laurie Lausard terminated. (jmk)
May 16, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Clara Marie Davis. (Attachments: #1 Letter Marked Attachments, #2 Number Marked Attachments, #3 Envelope) (jmk)
May 16, 2024 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Clara Marie Davis. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (jmk)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 4/24/2024 GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED. On or before May 24, 2024, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint curing the defects in her original complaint as described in this decision. If Plaintiff fails to do so within that time, the action will be dismissed. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party with blank amended complaint form and copy of the pro se non-prisoner guide and answer to pro se litigants' common questions.) (Griesbach, William)
April 22, 2024 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Clara Marie Davis re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (jmk)
April 22, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Clara Marie Davis. (jmk)
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT demanding a court trial against All Defendants filed by Clara Marie Davis. (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments, #2 Envelope) (jmk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Lutheran Social Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Marie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lutheran Social Services
Represented By: Bethany C McCurdy
Represented By: Kayla A McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Hoeper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Lausard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Wruck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?