Shawano School District v. D.W.
Plaintiff: Shawano School District
Defendant: D.W.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00770
Filed: June 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by D.W. - Waiver sent on 6/24/2024. (Rousseau, Jenna)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D Spitzer-Resnick on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey Spitzer-Resnick (Spitzer-Resnick, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Shawano School District. (Rousseau, Jenna)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to D.W. (mac)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D.W. by Shawano School District. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4704528) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decision, #2 Summons)(Rousseau, Jenna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2024: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh).
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shawano School District v. D.W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawano School District
Represented By: Jenna E Rousseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.W.
Represented By: Jeffrey D Spitzer-Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?