Temme et al v. Bemis Company Inc
Plaintiff: Thomas Temme and Shirley Temme
Defendant: Bemis Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2008cv00090
Filed: January 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Sheboygan
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185 Employee Pension Plan
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia J Gorence on 4/18/2011. The plaintiffs' 78 motion for preliminary injunction be and hereby is granted. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 8/26/09: denying 14 plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and a Permanent Injunction; granting 18 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and dismissing this action on its merits. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (nm)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 5/28/09: granting 12 plaintiffs' motion to certify this case as a class action; certifying the specified plaintiff class; designating the named plaintiffs as the class representatives and appointing plaintiffs' counsel as counsel for the class. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (nm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Temme et al v. Bemis Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Temme
Represented By: Sandra Graf Radtke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Temme
Represented By: Sandra Graf Radtke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bemis Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?