Girl Scouts of Manitou Council Inc v. Girl Scouts of the United States of America Inc

Plaintiff: Girl Scouts of Manitou Council Inc
Defendant: Girl Scouts of the United States of America Inc
Case Number: 2:2008cv00184
Filed: February 29, 2008
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Sheboygan
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/16/09 denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (nm)
April 17, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/17/09 as follows: granting in part 116 defendant's motion to strike plaintiff's amendment to the complaint; striking 112 plaintiff's amendment to the complaint from the record without prejudice; granting 120 plaintiff's motion for leave to file instanter a second amended complaint - the Clerk is directed to detach the amended pleading and file it as the second amended complaint in this action. (cc: all counsel) (nm)
March 31, 2010 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/31/10: granting 134 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on "all causes of action asserted against it in Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint"; denying 141 plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on liability only at Counts I and II of its Second Amended Complaint; and, dismissing this action with prejudice. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (nm)
June 3, 2010 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 6/3/10 denying 178 plaintiff's Motion to Stay or Restore Injunction Pursuant to Rule 62. (cc: all counsel) (nm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Girl Scouts of Manitou Council Inc v. Girl Scouts of the United States of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Girl Scouts of Manitou Council Inc
Represented By: Gary W Leydig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Girl Scouts of the United States of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.