Fond du Lac Bumper Exchange Inc v. Jui Li Enterprise Company Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Fond du Lac Bumper Exchange Inc
Defendant: Jui Li Enterprise Company Ltd, Tong Yang Industry Co Ltd, Taiwan Kai Yih Industrial Co Ltd, Gordon Auto Body Parts, Gordon Auto Parts USA Corp and Auto Parts Industrial Ltd
Case Number: 2:2009cv00852
Filed: September 4, 2009
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Fond du Lac
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2016 910 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/24/16 that direct purchaser plaintiffs motion to certify class 710 is GRANTED. Further ordering that the parties motions to seal/motions to restrict 709 , 788 , 811 , 839 , 849 , 858 , [88 2], 888 are DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall make the relevant documents publicly available. Further ordering that direct purchaser plaintiffs motion to seal 801 is DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall make the relevant documents publicly available. Further ordering that Jui Lis motion to compel 780 is DENIED without prejudice. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
February 26, 2016 879 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/26/16 that defendants motion to exclude 844 is DENIED. Further ordering that the parties motions to seal 843 , 864 , 870 are DENIED. The Clerk shall file these documents publicly. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
December 16, 2015 835 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/16/15 granting 715 Motion to Seal Document; denying 716 Motion for Recusal; granting 741 Motion to Seal Document; granting 747 Motion to Seal Document; granting 758 Motion to Seal Document. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
August 13, 2015 751 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/13/15 granting 686 Motion for Attorney Fees. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
February 10, 2015 572 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/10/15 REVOKING my February 9, 2015 order 570 . Henceforth, the parties should rely on my oral rulings with respect to all issues discussed and should not submit proposed orders of my oral rulings but instead rely on the available transcripts. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
January 12, 2015 533 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/12/14 denying 487 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
December 15, 2014 529 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/15/14 that a telephonic status conference will be held on January 6, 2015 at 11:15 a.m. CDT. Participants need to call in for the conference as follows: dial access number 1-877-336-1839. You will be prompted for an access code (4144803) and a security code (1234). Once that information is entered participants will be put on hold until we access the call. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
February 18, 2014 443 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/18/14 that the parties have 10 days to show good cause why the motion to file documents under seal 409 should be granted. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
January 9, 2013 352 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/9/13 that the parties have 10 days to show good cause why the motions to file documents under seal 323 , 329 , 332 should be granted. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
September 5, 2012 305 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/5/12 denying 247 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
May 15, 2012 297 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/15/12 that defendants shall produce all documents responsive to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Document Request No. 37. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
May 4, 2012 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/4/2012 granting (261) Motion to Dismiss Party in case 2:09-cv-00852-LA; granting (58) Motion to Dismiss Party in case 2:10-cv-00224-LA. The Vehimax Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. (cc: all counsel) (nts)
March 14, 2012 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/14/12 that the parties have 10 days to show good cause why the motion to file documents under seal 274 should be granted. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
July 6, 2011 201 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/6/11 denying 138 Motion for Reconsideration; 141 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 142 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 162 Motion for Reconsideration. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
November 30, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/30/10 denying 71 Motion to Dismiss; denying 74 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 76 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 80 Motion to Stay; denying 84 Motion to Dismiss; denying 86 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 92 Motion to Stay; granting 124 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental brief. (cc: all counsel) (Adelman, L.)(dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fond du Lac Bumper Exchange Inc v. Jui Li Enterprise Company Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fond du Lac Bumper Exchange Inc
Represented By: K Scott Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jui Li Enterprise Company Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tong Yang Industry Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taiwan Kai Yih Industrial Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Auto Body Parts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Auto Parts USA Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Parts Industrial Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?