July 16, 2018 |
Filing
1168
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/16/18. IT IS ORDERED that API's motion to set aside the entry of default against it 1116 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' motions for default judgment 1095 & 1104 are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a telephonic status conference will be held on 8/2/18 at 11:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that DPPs' motion to strike paragraph 8 of the declaration of Gretchen Jankowski 1144 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that IP Ps' motion to seal exhibits to its opposition brief and references thereto in the brief itself 1125 is DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall publicly file the pertinent materials. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that API's motion to seal portions of its reply brief 1137 is DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall publicly file the pertinent materials. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that API's motion to compel production of a claims-administration report 1161 is DENIED. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
|
April 12, 2018 |
Filing
1159
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 04/12/2018. IT IS ORDERED that defendants' motion for reconsideration 1157 is DENIED. (cc: all counsel) (lls)
|
June 24, 2016 |
Filing
910
DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/24/16 that direct purchaser plaintiffs motion to certify class 710 is GRANTED. Further ordering that the parties motions to seal/motions to restrict 709 , 788 , 811 , 839 , 849 , 858 , [88 2], 888 are DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall make the relevant documents publicly available. Further ordering that direct purchaser plaintiffs motion to seal 801 is DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall make the relevant documents publicly available. Further ordering that Jui Lis motion to compel 780 is DENIED without prejudice. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
|
February 26, 2016 |
Filing
879
DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/26/16 that defendants motion to exclude 844 is DENIED. Further ordering that the parties motions to seal 843 , 864 , 870 are DENIED. The Clerk shall file these documents publicly. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
|
December 16, 2015 |
Filing
835
DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/16/15 granting 715 Motion to Seal Document; denying 716 Motion for Recusal; granting 741 Motion to Seal Document; granting 747 Motion to Seal Document; granting 758 Motion to Seal Document. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
|
August 13, 2015 |
Filing
751
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/13/15 granting 686 Motion for Attorney Fees. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
|
February 10, 2015 |
Filing
572
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/10/15 REVOKING my February 9, 2015 order 570 . Henceforth, the parties should rely on my oral rulings with respect to all issues discussed and should not submit proposed orders of my oral rulings but instead rely on the available transcripts. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
|
January 12, 2015 |
Filing
533
DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/12/14 denying 487 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
|
December 15, 2014 |
Filing
529
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/15/14 that a telephonic status conference will be held on January 6, 2015 at 11:15 a.m. CDT. Participants need to call in for the conference as follows: dial access number 1-877-336-1839. You will be prompted for an access code (4144803) and a security code (1234). Once that information is entered participants will be put on hold until we access the call. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
|
February 18, 2014 |
Filing
443
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/18/14 that the parties have 10 days to show good cause why the motion to file documents under seal 409 should be granted. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
|
January 9, 2013 |
Filing
352
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/9/13 that the parties have 10 days to show good cause why the motions to file documents under seal 323 , 329 , 332 should be granted. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
|
September 5, 2012 |
Filing
305
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/5/12 denying 247 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
|
May 15, 2012 |
Filing
297
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/15/12 that defendants shall produce all documents responsive to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Document Request No. 37. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
|
May 4, 2012 |
Filing
291
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/4/2012 granting (261) Motion to Dismiss Party in case 2:09-cv-00852-LA; granting (58) Motion to Dismiss Party in case 2:10-cv-00224-LA. The Vehimax Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. (cc: all counsel) (nts)
|
March 14, 2012 |
Filing
275
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/14/12 that the parties have 10 days to show good cause why the motion to file documents under seal 274 should be granted. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
|
July 6, 2011 |
Filing
201
DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/6/11 denying 138 Motion for Reconsideration; 141 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 142 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 162 Motion for Reconsideration. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
|
November 30, 2010 |
Filing
129
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/30/10 denying 71 Motion to Dismiss; denying 74 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 76 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 80 Motion to Stay; denying 84 Motion to Dismiss; denying 86 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 92 Motion to Stay; granting 124 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental brief. (cc: all counsel) (Adelman, L.)(dm)
|