United States of America et al v. Dean Foods Company

Plaintiff: United States of America, State of Wisconsin, State of Illinois and State of Michigan
Defendant: Dean Foods Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv00059
Filed: January 22, 2010
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/3/11 granting in part and denying in part 57 defendant's motion to compel compliance with subpoena duces tecum; granting in part and denying in part 65 plaintiff's motion to quash or modify the subpoena - Lamers shall produce the documents consistent with the rulings of the court herein within 30 days from the date of this order. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (nm)
January 3, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 1/3/11 denying 47 Red Barn Family Farm's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (nm)
October 8, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/8/10 granting 33 defendant's Motion to Compel Answer to the First Interrogatory of Dean Foods Company; the plaintiffs shall respond to defendants First Interrogatory within 30 days from the date of this order. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (nm)
April 7, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/7/10 denying 15 defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (nm)
February 9, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/9/10 denying 3 Robert Pratt's request for waiver of the prescribed admission fee. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(nm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Dean Foods Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christine A Varney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Steven P Means
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: Robert W Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Michigan
Represented By: DJ Pascoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Foods Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?