Mohamed v. Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren SC et al

Plaintiff: Timur Mohamed
Defendant: Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren SC and Chicago Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv00753
Filed: September 1, 2010
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Aaron E Goodstein
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2014 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 7/16/2014. Reinhart SHALL RECOVER $2,543.540.07 from Freer based on its claims for indemnification and subrogation and Mohamed's March 2013 assignment of claims, plus allowable costs; Chicago Title shall recover $475,000 from Freer based on its claims of indemnification and subrogation, plus allowable costs. Reinhart and Chicago Title may file Bill of Costs with the Clerk of Court. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 25, 2014 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 4/25/2014 GRANTING 198 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys David J. Hanus, Elizabeth A. Odian, Thomas P. McGarry and Jill M. Munson terminated. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
January 9, 2014 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 1/9/2014. By 1/31/2014 counsel for Freer to provide addional information as outlined in this Order with respect to 198 MOTION to Withdraw. (cc: all counsel, via email to Carl Freer at cjf@aluminaid.com)(cb)
September 24, 2013 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 9/24/2013 GRANTING 186 Motion to Amend/Correct Third-Party Complaint. Clerk of Court DIRECTED to file [186-1] amended Third-Party Complaint. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
June 26, 2013 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 6/26/2013. 116 Freer's MOTION for Summary Judgment DENIED; 120 Chicago Title's MOTION for Summary Judgment DISMISSED with respect to assigned claims of Mohamed and Reinhart cross-claims and DENI ED with respect to cross-claims against Freer; 122 Reinhart's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment DISMISSED with respect to Chicago Title's cross-claims and DENIED with respect to third-party claims against Freer. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2013 at 9:30 AM (changed from 10:00) before Judge Rudolph T. Randa. The Court will initiate the call. Motions in limine due 7/3/2013; responses to those motions due 7/10/2013; replies due 7/15/2013. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
June 7, 2013 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 6/7/2013 re 167 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. By 6/30/2013 counsel for Freer should provide additional information with respect to Motion to withdraw. See Order for details. (cc: all counsel, via email to Carl Freer at cjf@aluminaid.com)(cb)
February 14, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 2/14/2013 GRANTING 110 Rule 7(h) Expedited MOTION for Leave to Depose Third-Party Defendant. Carl Johan Freer MUST submit to deposition by 2/22/2013; Dispositive Motions now due by 3/4/2013. All remaining provisions of the Court's 3/30/2012 scheduling Order REMAIN IN EFFECT. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 17, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 10/17/2012 DENYING 95 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; DENYING 97 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Expedite Protective Order both filed by Carl Johan Freer. NO LATER THAN November 5, 2012, Reinhart must file Amended Third-Party Complaint against Freer consistent with this Decision and Order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 26, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T Randa on 4/26/2012 Granting 46 Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED TO FILE the proposed amended complaint 47 as the Amended Complaint in this action. (cc: all counsel) (nts)
May 9, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T Randa on 05/09/2011 denying 18 Motion to Dismiss and converting to a motion for summary judgment; denying 21 Motion to Dismiss and converting to a motion for summary judgment; granting 24 to the extent that the D efendants' motions for dismissal are denied and are converted into summary judgment motions; and the parties will be allowed to conduct discovery on the statute of limitations issue before supplementing their filings. Setting telephonic Scheduling Conference for 5/26/2011 02:00 PM before Judge Rudolph T Randa. The Court will initiate the call. (cc: all counsel) (Koll, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohamed v. Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren SC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timur Mohamed
Represented By: Nathan I Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren SC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?