Doe v. Raemisch et al

Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Rick Raemisch, Lance Wiersma and State of Wisconsin Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2010cv00911
Filed: October 14, 2010
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER granting 68 Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 03/29/2013. Plaintiffs are awarded attorney fees and costs in the amount of $23,616. See Decision and Order for full detail. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
January 4, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 1/3/2013 denying 58 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 60 Motion to Alter Judgment. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
August 28, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 08/28/2012, granting 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs motion is GRANTED as to the $100 fine provision , but is DENIED in all other respects. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment declaring that imposition of the $100 annual fee on Plaintiffs pursuant to Wis. Stat. § 301.45(10) constitutes punishment in violation of their rights under the ex post facto clauses of the United States and Wisconsin constitutions and enjoining Defendants from assessing or collecting such amount from Plaintiffs. All other claims against Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. See Decision and Order for full detail. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Raemisch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: James A Walrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Raemisch
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Wiersma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?