Brownmark Films, LLC v. Paramount Pictures Corporation et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Brownmark Films, LLC
Defendant: Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc, Comedy Partners, MTV Networks and South Park Digital Studios LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv01013
Filed: November 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 11/30/11 granting 34 defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs; the plaintiff shall submit an affidavit detailing its financial status and an accompanying brief, which shall not exceed 3 pages, by 12/20/11; and, the defendants may submit a responsive brief, which shall not exceed 3 pages, by 12/30/11- if the defendants do not wish to file a responsive brief, they shall submit documentation to the Court notifying it of such decision. See Order. (cc: all counsel)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 9/27/11 as follows: denying 39 plaintiff's Motion to Strike; granting 40 plaintiff's Motion for an Order setting a briefing schedule - defendants Initial Brief in Support of Their Objections to the Declaration of Caz McChrystal and Robert Ciraldo shall not exceed 10 pages and shall be submitted by 10/14/11, plaintiffs Response Brief shall not exceed 10 pages and shall be submitted by 11/4/11, and defendants Reply Brief shall not exceed 5 pages and shall be submitted by 11/18/11; the plaintiff's sur-reply brief 41 shall be disregarded from the Courts' consideration in reaching a decision on the issues of attorney fees and costs. (cc: all counsel)
July 20, 2011 Filing 34 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Wickers Dec with Exhibits A-I, # 3 Peterson Dec with Exhibit J, # 4 Appendix, # 5 Proposed Order)
July 6, 2011 Filing 24 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved as to form by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 7/6/11 granting 8 defendants' motion to dismiss and DISMISSED this case with prejudice. (cc: all counsel)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 7/6/11 granting 8 defendants' Motion to Dismiss and DISMISSING this case with prejudice. (cc: all counsel)
March 30, 2011 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Brownmark Films, LLC's Amended Complaint.
March 15, 2011 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Brownmark Films LLC re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Brownmark Films, LLC's Amended Complaint.
February 22, 2011 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Jeff Glasser in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Brownmark Films, LLC's Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Video of "What What (In The Butt)", # 2 Exhibit 2 - Video of South Park episode "Canada On Strike", # 3 Exhibit 3 - Screen Shot from original "What What (In The Butt)" music video)
February 22, 2011 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Brownmark Films, LLC's Amended Complaint.
February 22, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Brownmark Films, LLC's Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brownmark Films, LLC v. Paramount Pictures Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comedy Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTV Networks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Park Digital Studios LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brownmark Films, LLC
Represented By: Caz J McChrystal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?