Himmel v. Bucyrus International Inc et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Himmel
Defendant: Robert K Ortberg, Theodore C Rogers, Michelle L Collins, Deepak T Kapur, Paul W Jones, Robert C Scharp, Robert L Purdum, Gene E Little, Bucyrus International Inc, Timothy W Sullivan, Caterpillar Inc, Badger Merger Sub Inc and Craig R Mackus
Consolidated Plaintiff: Edmund J Impens, Evelyn Greenberg, City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System and Thomas Turberg
Case Number: 2:2010cv01104
Filed: December 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Charles N Clevert
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2014 Filing 76 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr on 4/11/14. (cc: all counsel)(nts)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr on 4/11/2014, Regarding #66 Motion to Dismiss the second amended complaint and DISMISSING CASE. (cc: all counsel)(nts)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint #66 signed by Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr on 3/28/14. Written decision shall issue forthwith. (cc: all counsel) ((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 2, 2013 Filing 73 NOTICE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System, Evelyn Greenberg, Daniel Himmel, Edmund J Impens Notice of Firm Name Change (Wissbroecker, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 72 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Unpublished Authorities, #2 Certificate of Service)(Pollack, Howard)
February 29, 2012 Filing 71 BRIEF in Opposition filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint . (Wissbroecker, David)
January 13, 2012 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants (Perkins, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2012 Filing 69 AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Defendants. Corrected Appendix of Unpublished Authorities to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #67 (Perkins, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2012 Filing 68 AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Defendants. Corrected Exhibit A - Definitive Proxy to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #67 (Perkins, Elizabeth)
January 12, 2012 Filing 67 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Definitive Proxy, #2 Exhibit Cert of Incorp, #3 Exhibit Transcript of PI decision, #4 Appendix Unpublished Authorities)(Perkins, Elizabeth)
January 12, 2012 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Perkins, Elizabeth)
December 9, 2011 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Craig R Mackus, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan (Conley, Daniel)
December 9, 2011 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E Conley on behalf of Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Craig R Mackus, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel E. Conley (Conley, Daniel)
November 29, 2011 Filing 63 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duties and Violations of sec. 14(a) and 20(a) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 with Jury Demand against Badger Merger Sub Inc, Bucyrus International Inc, Caterpillar Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System.(Wissbroecker, David)
November 8, 2011 Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER: Scheduling/Status Conference held on 11/8/11. Court appoints City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System as lead plaintiff (granting docket #59 ) and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd as lead counsel for plaintiffs. Plaintiffs are granted 20 days to file an amended complaint. Defendants are granted 45 days to respond to the complaint. If a motion to dismiss is filed, plaintiffs will have 45 days to respond and defendants will have 30 days to reply. (Tape #9:09-9:18) ((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.) - [Modified Appearances for Defendant from Badger Meter to Badger Merger] Modified text on 11/8/2011 (kah).
November 4, 2011 Filing 61 NOTICE by Edmund J Impens Daniel Himmel Impens of Non-Opposition to Motion to Consolidate (Elliott, Robert) Modified filer on 11/4/2011 (kah).
November 1, 2011 Filing 60 LETTER from Stephen J. Oddo to the Honorable Charles N. Clevert Jr. Regarding Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Counsel. (Oddo, Stephen)
October 31, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #59 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff: Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 222, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Chief Judge Charles N Clevert Jr. (cc: all counsel)(kah)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Dismissing Two Cases and Continuing Consolidation in Case No. 10-C-1104. Case Nos. 10-C-1103 and 10-C-1105 are severed from consolidation and dismissed. Case Nos. 10-C-1104, 10-C-1106 and 10-C-1179 remain consolidated in Case No. 10-C-1104. Parties shall file all documents in Case No. 10-C-1104. (cc: all counsel)((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr on 9/23/11 denying #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying as duplicative #24 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #32 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying without prejudice #35 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice #36 Motion to Dismiss; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all further filings shall be docketed in Case No. 10-C-1103. (cc: all counsel) (kah)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Denying as Moot Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.'s Civil L.R. 7(H) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion to Consolidate Actions #12 . (cc: all counsel) ((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court #18 . (cc: all counsel) ((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
March 7, 2011 Filing 54 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court (and in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand). (Pollack, Howard)
March 4, 2011 Filing 53 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Himmel's Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pollack, Howard)
March 4, 2011 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Craig R Mackus, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan (Hernandez, Cristina)
March 4, 2011 Filing 51 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Craig R Mackus, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Himmel's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Supplement Unreported Cases)(Hernandez, Cristina)
February 22, 2011 Filing 59 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System (originally filed as Doc 67 in former Leadcase 10-cv-1103). (kah)
February 17, 2011 Filing 50 NOTICE by Daniel Himmel Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oddo, Stephen)
February 11, 2011 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Oddo in Support of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Remand Action to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Oddo, Stephen)
February 11, 2011 Filing 48 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Daniel Himmel re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Oddo, Stephen)
February 11, 2011 Filing 47 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Daniel Himmel re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Himmel's Complaint by Caterpillar Inc. and Badger Merger Sub, Inc.. (Oddo, Stephen)
February 11, 2011 Filing 46 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Daniel Himmel re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Himmel's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by the Bucyrus Defendants. (Oddo, Stephen)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Extending Deadlines for Reply in Support of Motion to Remand Action to State Court and Oppositions to Motions to Dismiss. (cc: all counsel)((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 24, 2011 Filing 41 STIPULATION Extending Deadlines for Reply in Support of Motion to Remand Action to State Court and Oppositions to Motions to Dismiss by Daniel Himmel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Oddo, Stephen)
January 19, 2011 Filing 44 MINUTES. Court convened on 1/19/11. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is Denied. #47 An order shall be issued forthwith. (Court Reporter Heidi Trapp) ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 19, 2011 NOTICE to Parties in this Case and to Parties in Related Cases 10-C-1103, 10-C-1104, 10-C-1105 and 10-C-1179: Court will convene at 3:00 PM on 1/19/11 in Courtroom 222 to render an Oral Decision on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 18, 2011 Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER. Court hears oral argument on 1/18/11 as to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and takes the matter under advisement. Counsel is to advise by 4:00 PM today on whether plaintiff(s) are able to post bond of at least $1,000,000.00. Plaintiff's Exhibits 1-12 (various proxy statements) are received into evidence. See separate filing. (Court Reporter Heidi Trapp) ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 12, 2011 Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER. Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/12/11. Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 1/18/11 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 222. See Minutes for additional information. (Court Reporter Sheryl Stawski) ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 12, 2011 NOTICE to Parties in this Case and to Parties in Related Cases 10-C-1103, 10-C-1104, 10-C-1105 and 10-C-1179: Telephonic Status Conference re Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 1/12/11 at 2:00 PM. Atty Condon to initiate conference call. ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 11, 2011 Filing 40 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Pollack, Howard)
January 6, 2011 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Craig R Mackus, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan re: Docket Nos. 35 and 38 (Hernandez, Cristina)
January 5, 2011 Filing 38 BRIEF in Support filed by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Craig R Mackus, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Himmel's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Unpublished Cases)(Hernandez, Cristina)
January 5, 2011 Filing 37 BRIEF in Support filed by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Himmel's Complaint. (Pollack, Howard)
January 5, 2011 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Himmel's Complaint by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc. (Pollack, Howard)
January 5, 2011 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Himmel's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Craig R Mackus, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan. (Hernandez, Cristina)
January 4, 2011 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Evelyn Greenberg, Thomas Turberg re Doc No. 33 (Syrios, David)
January 4, 2011 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Evelyn Greenberg, Thomas Turberg re #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases With the Four Actions Subject to Its Previous Consolidation Motion. (Syrios, David)
January 3, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases With the Four Actions Subject to Its Previous Consolidation Motion by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc. (Pollack, Howard)
December 23, 2010 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System [re Doc No. 30] (Wagner, K)
December 23, 2010 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System re #14 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Appoint Counsel , Both Lead and Liaison, for the Class Plaintiff City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System's Response to Plaintiffs Greenberg's and Turberg's Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublised Case)(Wagner, K)
December 23, 2010 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Craig R Mackus, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 23, 2010 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Daniel Himmel, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Craig R Mackus, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive). (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 23, 2010 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System [re Doc Nos. 24-26] (Wagner, K)
December 23, 2010 Filing 26 DECLARATION of K. Scott Wagner in Support of Plaintiff City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System's Motion for the Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiff's Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kinder Morgan, #2 Exhibit B - ACS Shareholders, #3 Exhibit C - TD Banknorth, #4 Exhibit D - Chapparal Resources, #5 Exhibit E - Dollar General, #6 Exhibit F - Prime Hospitality, #7 Exhibit G - UnitedGlobalCom, #8 Exhibit H - eMachines Inc. Merger, #9 Exhibit I - PETCO Animal Supplies, #10 Exhibit J - Fisch v. SSA Global, #11 Exhibit K - Pang v. Dwight, #12 Exhibit L - Robbins Geller firm resume, #13 Exhibit M - Prime Hospitality excerpts, #14 Exhibit N - TD Banknorth excerpts, #15 Exhibit O - Hale & Wagner firm resume)(Wagner, K)
December 23, 2010 Filing 25 BRIEF in Support filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System re #24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Cases)(Wagner, K)
December 23, 2010 Filing 24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System's Motion for the Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiff's Counsel)(Wagner, K)
December 23, 2010 Filing 23 REFILED - SEE DOCKET #24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Daniel Himmel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System's Motion for the Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiff's Counsel)(Wagner, K) Modified on 12/23/2010 per phone call with K. Wagner's office. (mlm).
December 22, 2010 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Himmel [re Doc No. 21] (Wagner, K)
December 22, 2010 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Daniel Himmel re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive). (Wagner, K)
December 21, 2010 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Himmel (Cabaniss, John)
December 21, 2010 Filing 19 BRIEF in Support filed by Daniel Himmel re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cabaniss, John)
December 21, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Daniel Himmel. (Cabaniss, John)
December 21, 2010 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE Statement by Daniel Himmel. (Cabaniss, John)
December 20, 2010 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Evelyn Greenberg, Thomas Turberg re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive). (Syrios, David)
December 20, 2010 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Corey Mather in Support of Plaintiffs Evelyn Greenberg and Thomas Turberg's Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion to Appoint Counsel, Both Lead and Liaison, for the Class. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Syrios, David)
December 20, 2010 Filing 14 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Appoint Counsel , Both Lead and Liaison, for the Class by Evelyn Greenberg, Thomas Turberg. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Syrios, David)
December 16, 2010 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc (Pollack, Howard)
December 16, 2010 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive) by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc. (Pollack, Howard)
December 15, 2010 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Craig R Mackus, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan Docket No. 10 (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 15, 2010 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Craig R Mackus, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Cristina)
December 10, 2010 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr. Magistrate Judge William E Callahan, Jr no longer assigned to the case due to non consent. (cms)
December 9, 2010 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Himmel [re: Doc No. 8] (Wagner, K)
December 9, 2010 Filing 8 Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Daniel Himmel. (Wagner, K)
December 9, 2010 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc (And Filing of Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Pollack, Howard)
December 9, 2010 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc., Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Craig R Mackus, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan re: Docket Nos. 3, 4, and 5 (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 9, 2010 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Bucyrus International Inc.. (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 9, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina D Hernandez on behalf of Craig R Mackus. Attorney(s) appearing: Cristina D. Hernandez, Elizabeth C. Perkins, and Natalie G. Maciolek (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 9, 2010 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines for further guidance (cms)
December 8, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina D Hernandez on behalf of Bucyrus International Inc., Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Craig R Mackus, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan. Attorney(s) appearing: Cristina D. Hernandez, Elizabeth C. Perkins, and Natalie G. Maciolek (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 8, 2010 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Callahan, Jr ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Callahan to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our web site. (blr)
December 8, 2010 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc. (Pollack, Howard)
December 8, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 10cv019653 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $350 receipt number 0757-1219243) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pollack, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Himmel v. Bucyrus International Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K Ortberg
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore C Rogers
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle L Collins
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepak T Kapur
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul W Jones
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C Scharp
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Purdum
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene E Little
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bucyrus International Inc
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy W Sullivan
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc
Represented By: Matthew B Kilby
Represented By: Howard A Pollack
Represented By: James W Ducayet
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badger Merger Sub Inc
Represented By: Matthew B Kilby
Represented By: Howard A Pollack
Represented By: James W Ducayet
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig R Mackus
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Edmund J Impens
Represented By: Robert L Elliott
Represented By: William Scott Holleman
Represented By: Eduard Korsinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Evelyn Greenberg
Represented By: David J Syrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Randall J Baron
Represented By: Cullin A O'Brien
Represented By: Michael J Vanoverbeke
Represented By: Jacques C Condon
Represented By: Heather M Friedl
Represented By: A Rick Atwood, Jr
Represented By: K Scott Wagner
Represented By: David T Wissbroecker
Represented By: Stuart A Davidson
Represented By: Thomas C Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Thomas Turberg
Represented By: David J Syrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Himmel
Represented By: John C Cabaniss
Represented By: Robbins Umeda
Represented By: Marc M Umeda
Represented By: Stephen J Oddo
Represented By: Arshan Amiri
Represented By: Rebecca A Peterson
Represented By: William C Wright
Represented By: Heather M Friedl
Represented By: K Scott Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?