Wisconsin Carry Inc et al v. City of Milwaukee et al

Plaintiff: Wisconsin Carry Inc and Nazir Al-Mujaahid
Defendant: City of Milwaukee, John T Chisholm, Patti Klein, Mark Walton and Joseph Mendolla
Case Number: 2:2012cv00352
Filed: April 13, 2012
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: William E Callahan
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/7/15 that this case will be called for trial on January 20, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
July 28, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/28/2014 granting in part and denying in part 53 & 58 Motions for Summary Judgment. The motion is GRANTED as to all plaintiffs claims for declaratory relief against all defendants;The motion is GRANTED as to plaintiff Al-Mujaahids claim for injunctive relief;The motion is GRANTED as to plaintiff Sutterfields state open records claim; and The motion is DENIED as to plaintiff Sutterfields excessive force claim. (cc: all counsel) (nts)
July 11, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/11/14 that the parties may submit briefs on the issue of standing by Monday, July 21, 2014. (cc: all counsel)(dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisconsin Carry Inc et al v. City of Milwaukee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Carry Inc
Represented By: John R Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nazir Al-Mujaahid
Represented By: John R Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Milwaukee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T Chisholm
Represented By: Christopher J Blythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Mendolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?