Lizalek et al v. Milwaukee County et al
Plaintiff: Gary Charles Lizalek, Karen Nancy Lizalek and United States of America Land Patent Certificate No 559
Defendant: Lot 7 Block 2 in Mount Royal Estates and Milwaukee County
Case Number: 2:2012cv01005
Filed: October 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 9/27/2013 DENYING 25 Motion to Recall Mandate and Amend/Correct Complaint. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to plaintiffs) (cb)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 7/2/2013. 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Milwaukee County GRANTED based on lack of subject matter jurisdiction and DISMISSED in all other respects; 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Karen Nancy Lizalek, Gary Charles Lizalek DISMISSED. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiffs)(cb)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 10/4/2012 DENYING 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for TRO. (cc: via US mail to Gary and Karen Lizalek c/o Tom Weiss, Agent, 6815 N. Ironwood Ln., Glendale, WI 53217; via US mail to Angelica Hutchins, Milwaukee Corporation Counsel's Office, 901 N. 9th St., Rm. 303, Milwaukee, WI 53233 ) (cb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lizalek et al v. Milwaukee County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lot 7 Block 2 in Mount Royal Estates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County
Represented By: James M Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Charles Lizalek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Nancy Lizalek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America Land Patent Certificate No 559
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?