United States of America v. Adent et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Joyce Adent, Leonard G Adent, Derek Adent, BMO Harris Bank NA and Wisconsin Department of Revenue
Case Number: 2:2012cv01286
Filed: December 18, 2012
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Door
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 1/20/2016 DENYING 60 63 Adents' MOTIONS to Stay. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 20, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 10/20/2015 GRANTING 42 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment. Parcels A and B, described in paragraph 8 of the Complaint, to be sold at auction. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
June 9, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 6/9/2015 DENYING 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff can renew motion within 30 days; if no motion filed, matter will be set for trial to the Court. (cc: all counsel) (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Adent et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: LaQuita J Taylor-Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Adent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard G Adent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Adent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Revenue
Represented By: James D Harnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?