Staffa v. Pollard et al
Plaintiff: |
Mark P Staffa |
Defendant: |
William Pollard, David Burnett, P Sumnicht, Belinda Schrubbe and James Greer |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00005 |
Filed: |
January 2, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin |
Office: |
Milwaukee Office |
County: |
Dodge |
Presiding Judge: |
Rudolph T Randa |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 23, 2015 |
Filing
151
ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 10/23/2015 DENYING 150 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Mark Staffa at Waupun Correctional Institution) (cb)
|
August 25, 2015 |
Filing
148
ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 8/25/2015. 81 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment GRANTED. 136 Plaintiff's MOTION to remove clerk DENIED. 140 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File amended response GRANTED. Wis. Dept. of Corrections to collect $499.75 balance of appeal fee in No. 14-2124 from plaintiff's prison trust account. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
|
September 11, 2014 |
Filing
133
ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 9/11/2014. 119 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Counsel DENIED without prejudice; Plaintiff's request for leave to appeal GRANTED as to appeal of Court's 7/28/2014 Order denying request for inju nctive relief and DENIED as to appeal of Court's 7/28/2014 Order denying discovery-related motions and motion to convene jury; 129 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis GRANTED. Plaintiff not required to pay initial par tial filing fee. Wis. Dept. of Corrections to collect $505 balance of appeal fee from plaintiff's prison trust account pursuant to 28 USC § 1915(b)(2). Proceedings stayed until such time as Court of Appeals has resolved plaintiff's appeal from Court's denial of injunctive relief. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Warden and Mark Staffa at Waupun Correctional Institution, PLRA Attorney at 7th Circuit)(cb)
|
July 28, 2014 |
Filing
122
ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 7/28/2014. 106 Plaintiff's MOTION for jury DENIED; 113 Plaintiff's MOTION for temporary restraining order/injunction DENIED; 115 Defendants' MOTION to quash subpoena GRANTED; 116 Plaintiff's MOTION for copy of subpoenaed evidence/oral argument of evidence DENIED. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Mark Staffa at Waupun Correctional Institution)(cb)
|
January 3, 2014 |
Filing
68
ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 1/3/2014. STAY LIFTED: Discovery due 3/28/2014; Dispositive Motions due 4/30/2014. 50 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction DENIED. 54 REQUEST for Qualified Protective Order/Compel Discovery DENIED. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Mark Staffa at Waupun Correctional Institution)(cb)
|
May 31, 2013 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 5/31/2013 DENYING 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/Permanent Injunction; DENYING 16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/Permanent Injunction. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Mark Staffa at Waupun Correctional Institution)(cb)
|
April 9, 2013 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 4/9/2013 GRANTING 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Copies of this Order and plaintiff's complaint to be electronically sent to Wis. Dept. of Justice; Defendants to file responsive plead ing within 60 days of receipt of this Order; Dept. of Corrections shall collect $346.42 balance of filing fee in monthly payments from plaintiff's prison trust account. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Mark Staffa and Warden at Waupun Correctional Institution) (cb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?