Malibu Media LLC v. Doe

Plaintiff: Malibu Media LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 2:2013cv00536
Filed: May 13, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 11/5/2014 DENYING 43 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
December 12, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T Randa on 12/12/2013: Denying as Moot 19 Motion to Seal Exhibit C to the Complaint, Granting 22 Motion to file response to the Court's Order to show cause under seal, and Granting 26 Motion for Leave to File a brief amicus curiae in support of sanctions, in case 2:13-cv-00536-RTR; Denying as Moot (14) Motion to Seal Exhibit C to the Complaint, Granting (18) Motion to file response to the Court's Order to show cause under seal, and gra nting (20) Motion for Leave to File a brief amicus curiae in support of sanctions, in case 2:13-cv-00544-RTR; and Denying as Moot (9) Motion to Seal Exhibit C to the Complaint, Granting (12) Motion to file response to the Court's Order to show cause under seal, and Granting (14) Motion for Leave to File a brief amicus curiae in support of sanctions, in case 2:13-cv-00779-RTR. (cc: all counsel) (nts) Text Modified on 12/13/2013 (nts).
September 17, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 9/17/2013. 9 DENIED as to Motion to Quash, GRANTED as to Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously, GRANTED as to Motion to Seal Exhibit C to the Complaint. Clerk of Court directed to SEAL Exhibit C (ECF No. 1-3). Within 10 days of the date of this Order, plaintiff ordered to show cause as to why attaching Exhibit C to complaint does not violate FRCP 11(b). (cc: all counsel) (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media LLC
Represented By: Mary K Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?