Hanson v. Clements

Petitioner: Daniel L Hanson
Respondent: Marc W Clements
Case Number: 2:2013cv00896
Filed: August 7, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/25/13 denying 9 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying without prejudice 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 19 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 21 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 26 Motion for Default Judgment. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner) (dm)
September 25, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/25/14 granting 23 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court shall enter final judgment. I find that the petitioner has not made the showing required by 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2) , and I will not issue a certificate of appealability. Further ordering as follows: denying 39 Motion for Order; denying 41 Motion for Judgment; denying 43 Motion to Compel; denying 44 Motion for Order; denying 45 Motion for Order; de nying 46 Motion to Vacate ; denying 52 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 52 Motion for Contempt; denying 54 Motion for Hearing; denying 61 Motion for Order; denying 62 Motion ; denying 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 29 Motion for Discovery; denying 31 Motion for Hearing; denying 34 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 36 Motion for Discovery; denying 39 Motion. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner) (dm) Modified on 9/25/2014 (dm).
September 12, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/12/13 that within 30 days of the date of this order respondent ANSWER the petition, showing cause, if any, why the writ should not issue. Further ordering that unless respondent files a dispositive motion with its answer the parties shall abide by the briefing schedule set forth herein. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner)(dm)
March 20, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/20/15 denying 92 Motion for Reconsideration. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner) (dm)
March 24, 2015 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/24/15 granting 96 Motion to return original documents to him. The Clerk of Court shall return original maps and photos submitted with ECF 11 to petitioner. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner w/enc.) (dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson v. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel L Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marc W Clements
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.