Johnson v. United States of America

Petitioner: Ronald L Johnson
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2013cv01304
Filed: November 18, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T Randa on 1/26/2016 denying 32 Motion to Amend/Correct filed pro se by Ronald Johnson.. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Ronald Johnson - FCI Pekin, IL) (lz)
November 9, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 11/9/2015. 17 Johnson's MOTION for Discovery DENIED. 25 Johnson's four-part MOTION GRANTED as to withdrawal of his ACCA claim and a ruling on the merits, and DENIED in all other respects. 1 Johnson's MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) DENIED; the Court DECLINES to issue certificate of appealability. By 11/17/2015 government to publicly file a redacted version of 26 supplemental response that omits only the 3 sentences relating to the PSR. Sealing Order 27 Modified to delete statement that government's submission is sealed for one year. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Ronald Johnson at Pekin Federal Correctional Institution)(cb)
November 25, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 11/25/2013. United States MUST FILE answer on or before 1/27/2014. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Ronald Johnson at Terre Haute FCI, Attys. Peter Kovac, Russell Jones, Bradley Williams)(cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Lisa A Wesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?