Prime Choice Services Inc v. Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution Inc

Plaintiff: Prime Choice Services Inc
Defendant: Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv01435
Filed: December 23, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 89 Motion for New Trial. The amended judgment is vacated and a new trial is granted on the issue of damages. The matter will be placed on the court's calendar to discuss further scheduling. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
November 12, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 38 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
November 13, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion to Amend/Correct. Discovery due by 1/19/2015. Dispositive motions due by 2/2/2015. The current scheduling order shall remain in force in all other respects. Signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 11/13/2014. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prime Choice Services Inc v. Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Choice Services Inc
Represented By: Jacques C Condon
Represented By: Paul Everett Culpepper(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Timothy D Swanson(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution Inc
Represented By: Jonathan T Smies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?