Neisler v. Larson et al

Plaintiff: Mathew Neisler
Defendant: Donna Larson, Belinda Schrubbe, William Pollard and Waupun Correctional Institution
Case Number: 2:2014cv00655
Filed: June 6, 2014
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/1/2016 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 42 Motion for Contempt; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 42 Motion for Sanctions, GRANTING 42 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Directing Compliance with Subpoena, and ORDERING Aljan President Alan C. Burke to Respond to Subpoena on or Before March 4, 2016. (cc: all counsel and copy sent by US Mail to President of Aljan Company on February 1, 2016.) (kgw)
September 2, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/2/2015 DENYING 30 plaintiff's Motion to Compel and STAYING the case until the plaintiff notifies the court that he has obtained his medical records from Aljan. (cc: all counsel; by US Mail to plaintiff) (pwm)
June 19, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/19/2015 GRANTING 21 plaintiff's Motion for Discovery; DENYING 23 plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel, and DIRECTING plaintiff to respond to defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by August 24, 2015. (cc: all counsel; by US Mail to Plaintiff) (pwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neisler v. Larson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Neisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Schrubbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pollard
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waupun Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?