Jackson v. Foster et al
Plaintiff: |
Daniel Jackson |
Defendant: |
Warden Foster, Deputy Warden Cooper, Guard Pusich, Guard Butterfield and Guard Swiekatowski |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv01194 |
Filed: |
September 26, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin |
Office: |
Milwaukee Office |
County: |
Brown |
Presiding Judge: |
William E Callahan |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 9, 2015 |
Filing
54
ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/9/2015 DENYING 52 Plaintiff's Motion for Return of Filing Fee and Screening the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint.. (cc: all counsel, copy sent to the plaintiff and WI Dept. of Justice by US Mail on October 9, 2015.) (kgw)
|
April 20, 2015 |
Filing
49
DECISION and ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/20/2015 denying 39 Motion for Leave to File; denying 40 Motion for Leave to File; denying 41 Motion for Leave to File; denying 42 Motion for Leave to File; denying 43 Motion for Lea ve to File; denying 44 Motion for Leave to File; denying 45 Motion for Leave to File; denying 46 Motion for Leave to File; denying 47 Motion for Leave to File; granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 8 Moti on to Amend/Correct( Amended Complaint due by 5/25/2015); denying 9 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 11 Motion for Leave to File; denying 12 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 13 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 15 Motion for TRO; denyin g 15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 18 Motion for Leave to File; denying 22 Motion for Leave to File; denying 23 Motion for Order; denying 24 Motion to File; denying 25 Motion for Leave to File; denying 26 Motion for Leave to File; denying 28 Motion to Supplement; denying 29 Motion to Supplement; denying 31 Motion to Supplement; denying 32 Motion to Supplement; denying 33 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 34 Motion for Leave to File; d enying 35 Motion to Supplement; denying 36 Motion for Leave to File; denying 37 Motion for Leave to File; denying 38 Motion for Leave to File. Amended complaint due by May 25, 2015. (cc: all counsel, copy sent to the plaintiff and Warden at the Green Bay Correctional Institution by US Mail. A copy of instructions for filing a civil rights complaint under 42 USC §1983; prisoner cases sent to the plaintiff by US Mail.) (kgw)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?