Subotich et al v. Liuyang Dun Pai Fireworks Mfg et al
Plaintiff: Michael Subotich and Jennifer Subotich
Defendant: Liuyang Dun Pai Fireworks Mfg, Travlers Property Casualty Company of American and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Case Number: 2:2015cv00219
Filed: February 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 9/13/2017 DENYING 91 Defendant Matt Palazsynski's Motion to Set Aside Default. Hearing on 93 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default Judgment set for 12/1/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 7/7/2017: GRANTING 89 Defendant Matt Palazsynski's Second Motion to Supplement and GRANTING 77 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default. Clerk of Court DIRECTED to enter default against Defendants Matt Palazsynski, Dun Pai Fireworks Group, and Dun Pai Manufacturing. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 7/31/15: denying 16 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London; granting 18 Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London's Motion for Extension of Time; and accepting 17 Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London's late-filed Answer nunc pro tunc. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(nm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Subotich et al v. Liuyang Dun Pai Fireworks Mfg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Subotich
Represented By: Timothy S Trecek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Subotich
Represented By: Timothy S Trecek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liuyang Dun Pai Fireworks Mfg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travlers Property Casualty Company of American
Represented By: John A Griner, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?