Byrne v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Stuart A Byrne
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Case Number: 2:2016cv01380
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Kenosha
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 8/31/2017 ADOPTING 27 Parties' Stipulation for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs. An award of $5,888.80 in attorney's fees to be paid by Defendant in full satisfaction and settlement of any and all claims Plaintiff may have in this matter pursuant to the EAJA. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
May 30, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 5/30/2017: GRANTING 20 Defendant's Motion to Remand and REMANDING matter to the Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Sentence Four of Section 205 of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. §405(g). (cc: all counsel) (jm)
December 8, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J. P. Stadtmueller on 12/8/2016 DISMISSING CASE for failure to pay filing fee. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrne v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart A Byrne
Represented By: Meredith E Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?