Ali v. Eckstein et al

Plaintiff: Ouati K Ali
Defendant: Scott Eckstein, Michelle Haese, Michael Donovan, Alan DeGroot, Kelly Salinas and Cindy O'Donnell
Case Number: 2:2016cv01518
Filed: November 11, 2016
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2018 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 3/13/2018: GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 24 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; DISMISSING with prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Michael Donovan and Scott Eckstein; and DISMISSING Defendants Michael Donovan and Scott Eckstein from this action. See Order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Ouati K. Ali at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(jm)
February 23, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 2/23/2017 regarding 17 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's claim for violation of due process rights under the 14th Amendment in connection with the 1/13/2017 conduct report DISMISSED without prejudice. Defendants Patrick Brant, Brian Bauman, and Catherine Francios DISMISSED from action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Ouati K. Ali and Warden at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(jm)
February 9, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 2/9/2017 DENYING 11 Plaintiff's Request for Prison Transfer. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Ouati K. Ali at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(jm)
January 17, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 1/17/2017. Plaintiff's claim for violation of due process rights under 14th Amendment DISMISSED with prejudice. Defendants Kelli West, Kelly Salinas, Alan DeGroot and Cindy O'Donnell DISMISSED f rom action. Defendants Michael Donovan, Michelle Haese, and Scott Eckstein to file responsive pleading within 60 days of receiving electronic notice of this Order. See Order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Ouati K. Ali and Warden at Green Bay Correctional Institutuion)(jm)
December 19, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 12/19/2016 GRANTING 2 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Plaintiff to file amended pleading by 1/9/2017. Wisconsin DOC to collect balance of filing fee from Plaintiff's prison trust account per 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). (cc: all counsel, via mail to Ouati Ali and Warden at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Eckstein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ouati K Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Eckstein
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Haese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan DeGroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?