Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi et al v. Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc et al
Plaintiff: Goss and Robert Goss
Defendant: Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Inc, Scott D. Rued, HCI Equity Partners LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc, HCI Equity Management LP, Mark A Diblasi and Peter R Armbruster
Petitioner: Bryan Reifsnyder, Armin Leuze and Michael Easley
Consolidated Plaintiff: Robert Strougo
Lead Plaintiff: Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi
Case Number: 2:2017cv00144
Filed: January 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/4/2019. Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 82 LETTER to Judge Pepper. (Fox, Paul)
April 1, 2019 Filing 81 BRIEF in Support filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi re #80 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action . (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval, #3 Exhibit A-1 - Postcard Notice, #4 Exhibit A-2 - Notice of Pendency and Proposed Class Action Settlement and Motion for Attorneys' Fees, #5 Exhibit A-3 - Proof of Claim and Release, #6 Exhibit A-4 - Summary Notice of Pendency and Class Action Settlement and Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #7 Exhibit B - Proposed Final Judgment and Order)(Flanner, Mary)
April 1, 2019 Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Flanner, Mary)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/1/2019 re #78 Joint Report re: Finalization of Settlement and Following Motion for Preliminary Approval Proceedings. The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion to continue to STAY this case pending finalization of the settlement. The court ORDERS that the parties shall file a motion for preliminary approval of their settlement of this case within 14 days of the execution of their stipulation. The court further ORDERS that if the parties have not filed their motion for preliminary approval by 3/31/2019, they shall file a joint status report. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
January 31, 2019 Filing 78 STATUS REPORT by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Basser, Stephen)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/26/2018 re #76 Joint Stipulation to Stay Action Pending Finalization of Settlement and Following Motion for Preliminary Approval Proceedings. The court APPROVES the stipulation to stay this action pending finalization of the settlement. The court ORDERS the parties to file their motion for preliminary approval of settlement within sixty days of the execution of the stipulation. The court ORDERS that the parties must file a joint report documenting and memorializing the terms of the settlement by January 31, 2019 if they have not filed their motion for preliminary approval by that date. The court DENIES without prejudice all pending motions (dkt. nos. 48,50,51,55,59) while preserving their original filing dates. Any party may seek to reinstate the motion(s) if the case is not resolved by settlement. The court STAYS all deadlines and proceedings pending further action of the court. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
November 21, 2018 Filing 76 STIPULATION to stay action pending finalization of settlement and following motion for preliminary approval proceedings by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flanner, Mary)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/16/2018 re #74 Fifth Joint Stipulation Regarding Proposed Schedule. The court APPROVES the stipulated amendment of the scheduling order. The court ORDERS that the defendants shall file any replies in support of their motions to dismiss the case by the end of the day on November 19, 2018. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 12, 2018 Filing 74 STIPULATION - Fifth Joint Stipulation Regarding Proposed Schedule by Peter R Armbruster, Mark A Diblasi, HCI Equity Management LP, HCI Equity Partners LLC, Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc, Scott D. Rued. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fox, Paul)
September 24, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #73 Declaration; Attachments to documents should be clearly described - Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc. This document does not need to be re-filed.; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (vkb)
September 21, 2018 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Samuel M. Ward In Support of the Lead Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants Motion To Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit)(Basser, Stephen)
September 21, 2018 Filing 72 OBJECTIONS by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi . (Basser, Stephen)
September 21, 2018 Filing 71 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi re #50 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, #51 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint . (Basser, Stephen)
September 21, 2018 Filing 70 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi re #55 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, #48 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint MOTION for Joinder to Roadrunner's Motion to Dismiss #48 . (Basser, Stephen)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/13/2018 re #67 Joint Stipulation Regarding Page Limits on Briefs in Opposition to the Motions to Dismiss. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation. The court ORDERS that the lead plaintiff may file two briefs in opposition to the motions to dismiss: one in opposition to the motions of the RRTS defendants, which shall be no more than 75 pages long; and one in opposition to the motions of the HCI/Rued defendants, which shall be no more than 40 pages long. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 5, 2018 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi (Basser, Stephen)
September 5, 2018 Filing 67 STIPULATION by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Basser, Stephen)
August 29, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R DeVooght on behalf of Peter R Armbruster. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew R. DeVooght (DeVooght, Andrew)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/21/2018 re #64 Motion of Paul T. Fox and Brett Doran to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendants Mark Deblasi and Peter Armbruster. The court GRANTS the motion for withdrawal of counsel. The court ORDERS that Attorneys Fox and Doran's representation of defendants Deblasi and Armbruster is WITHDRAWN. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
August 20, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Peter R Armbruster, Mark A Diblasi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fox, Paul)
July 24, 2018 Filing 63 DISCLOSURE Statement by Peter R Armbruster. (Ruvinsky, Nina)
July 24, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #50 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Scott D. Rued; The Memorandum in Support attached to this document should have been filed as a separate entry. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (vkb)
July 24, 2018 Filing 62 DISCLOSURE Statement by HCI Equity Management LP. (Baish, Anthony)
July 24, 2018 Filing 61 DISCLOSURE Statement by HCI Equity Partners LLC. (Baish, Anthony)
July 23, 2018 Filing 60 BRIEF in Support filed by Peter R Armbruster re #59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint MOTION for Joinder to Roadrunner's Motion to Dismiss #48 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Ruvinsky, Nina)
July 23, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, MOTION for Joinder to Roadrunner's Motion to Dismiss #48 by Peter R Armbruster. (Ruvinsky, Nina)
July 23, 2018 Filing 58 DISCLOSURE Statement by Mark A Diblasi. (Lieberman, Michael)
July 23, 2018 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Michael W. Lieberman in Support of Motion of Defendant Mark A. DiBlasi to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Lieberman, Michael)
July 23, 2018 Filing 56 BRIEF in Support filed by Mark A Diblasi re #55 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint . (Lieberman, Michael)
July 23, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Mark A Diblasi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Lieberman, Michael)
July 23, 2018 Filing 54 PROPOSED CORRECTED Text of Proposed Order [Dkt 51] filed by HCI Equity Management LP, HCI Equity Partners LLC. (Baish, Anthony)
July 23, 2018 Filing 53 DECLARATION of William G. Hart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Baish, Anthony)
July 23, 2018 Filing 52 BRIEF in Support filed by HCI Equity Management LP, HCI Equity Partners LLC re #51 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Compendium of Unpublished Opinions, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10)(Baish, Anthony)
July 23, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by HCI Equity Management LP, HCI Equity Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baish, Anthony)
July 23, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Scott D. Rued. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Lamm, Julian)
July 23, 2018 Filing 49 BRIEF in Support filed by Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc re #48 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Fox, Paul)
July 23, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. (Fox, Paul)
July 23, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian A Lamm on behalf of Scott D. Rued. Attorney(s) appearing: Julian A. Lamm (Lamm, Julian)
July 23, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Nina Ruvinsky on behalf of Peter R Armbruster. Attorney(s) appearing: Nina Ruvinsky (Ruvinsky, Nina)
July 20, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Lieberman on behalf of Mark A Diblasi. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael W. Lieberman (Lieberman, Michael)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/20/2018 re #43 Fourth Joint Stipulation Regarding Proposed Schedule. The court APPROVES the stipulated amendment of the scheduling order. The court ORDERS that the defendants shall respond to the class action complaint by July 23, 2018; the lead plaintiff shall file its response, if any, to the defendants' response by September 21, 2018; the defendants shall file their reply, if any, to the lead plaintiff's response by October 19, 2018. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
June 19, 2018 Filing 43 STIPULATION - Fourth Joint Stipulation Regarding Proposed Schedule by Peter R Armbruster, Mark A Diblasi, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Fourth Joint)(Fox, Paul)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/15/2018 re #41 Third Joint Stipulation Regarding Proposed Schedule. The court APPROVES the stipulated amendment of the scheduling order. The court ORDERS that the defendants shall respond to the class action complaint within 45 days after the May 7, 2018 mediation before Judge Philips, or by June 21, 2018; the lead plaintiff shall file its response, if any, to the defendants' response by August 20, 2018; the defendants shall file their reply, if any, to the lead plaintiff's response by September 19, 2018. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
May 10, 2018 Filing 41 STIPULATION Third Joint - Regarding Proposed Schedule by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Third Proposed Scheduling Order)(Flanner, Mary)
April 6, 2018 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott D. Rued - Waiver sent on 3/14/2018. (Basser, Stephen)
April 6, 2018 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HCI Equity Partners LLC - Waiver sent on 3/14/2018. (Basser, Stephen)
April 6, 2018 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HCI Equity Management LP - Waiver sent on 3/14/2018. (Basser, Stephen)
March 13, 2018 Summons Issued as to HCI Equity Management LP, HCI Equity Partners LLC and Scott D. Rued. (vkb)
March 12, 2018 Filing 37 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi (Basser, Stephen)
March 12, 2018 Filing 36 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi (Basser, Stephen)
March 12, 2018 Filing 35 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi (Basser, Stephen)
March 12, 2018 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Basser, Stephen)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/21/2017 re #30 motion for withdrawal as counsel of record filed by the plaintiff. The court GRANTS the motion for withdrawal as counsel of record, dkt. no. 30. The court ORDERS that attorneys Anne M. Plichta and K. Scott Wagner are allowed to WITHDRAW as counsel of record for any party in this case. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
November 1, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE by Michael Easley, Armin Leuze, Robert Strougo of withdrawal of counsel (Eldridge, Mark)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/12/2017 APPROVING #31 Second Joint Stipulation Regarding Proposed Schedule. See order for details. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 3, 2017 Filing 31 STIPULATION Second Joint - Regarding Proposed Schedule by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Second Proposed Scheduling Order)(Flanner, Mary)
June 20, 2017 Filing 30 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by Robert Goss. (Wagner, K)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/7/2017 APPROVING #28 Stipulation Regarding Proposed Schedule. See order for details. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
June 5, 2017 Filing 28 STIPULATION /Joint Stipulation Regarding Proposed Schedule by Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doran, Brett)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/19/2017 GRANTING #18 Motion of the Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi for consolidation of related actions, appointment as lead plaintiff, and approval of lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel. (cc: all counsel) (pwm)
April 24, 2017 Filing 26 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support filed by Public Employees Retirement System Of Mississippi re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint MOTION for Order . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Basser, Stephen)
April 17, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE by Armin Leuze OF WITHDRAWAL OF LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTION OF ARMIN LEUZE (Ademi, Shpetim)
April 14, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Consolidate Related Actions, to be Appointed Lead Plaintiff, and to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel by Bryan Reifsnyder. (Plichta, Anne) Modified on 4/17/2017 (vkb)
April 13, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE by Michael Easley OF WITHDRAWAL OF LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTION OF MICHAEL EASLEY (Ademi, Shpetim)
April 3, 2017 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in support of the motion by Leuze for consolidation of the above captioned related actions, appointment as Lead Plaintiff for the Class, and approval of Leuze's selection of Pomerantz, LLP as Lead Counsel and Ademi & OReilly, LLP as Liaison Counsel for the Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Press release published over Globe Newswire on January 31, 2017, announcing the pendency of the first of the above-captioned actions to be filed, #2 Exhibit B: Shareholder Certification executed by Leuze, #3 Exhibit C: Loss Chart of Leuze, #4 Exhibit D: Firm resume of Pomerantz, #5 Exhibit E: Firm resume of Ademi)(Ademi, Shpetim)
April 3, 2017 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Samuel M Ward In Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FIFO LIFO, #2 Exhibit Goss Notice, #3 Exhibit MPERS Notice, #4 Exhibit Ray Certification, #5 Exhibit Firm Bio)(Flanner, Mary)
April 3, 2017 Filing 20 BRIEF in Support filed by Public Employees Retirement System Of Mississippi re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Lead Plaintiff . (Flanner, Mary)
April 3, 2017 Filing 19 BRIEF in Support filed by Armin Leuze re #17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Movant Leuze as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel approving Lead Plaintiffs selection of Pomerantz LLP as Lead Counsel and Ademi & OReilly, LLP as Liaison Counsel for the Class . (Ademi, Shpetim)
April 3, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Public Employees Retirement System Of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Flanner, Mary). Added MOTION to Appoint, MOTION for Order on 4/13/2017 (vkb)
April 3, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Movant Leuze as Lead Plaintiff , MOTION to Appoint Counsel approving Lead Plaintiffs selection of Pomerantz LLP as Lead Counsel and Ademi & OReilly, LLP as Liaison Counsel for the Class by Armin Leuze. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order For consolidation, appointment as lead plaintiff, and approval of counsel)(Ademi, Shpetim)
April 3, 2017 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Kim E. Miller in Support of the Motion of Bryan Reifsnyder to Consolidate Related Actions, to be Appointed Lead Plaintiff, and to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Plichta, Anne)
April 3, 2017 Filing 15 BRIEF in Support filed by Bryan Reifsnyder re #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , To Be Appointed Lead Plaintiff, and to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel . (Plichta, Anne)
April 3, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , To Be Appointed Lead Plaintiff, and to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel by Bryan Reifsnyder. (Plichta, Anne). Added MOTION to Appoint, MOTION for Order on 4/13/2017 (vkb)
April 3, 2017 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Shpetim Ademi in support of Movant's motion to consolidate actions, appoint Lead Plaintiff and approve Movant's selection of Lead Counsel and Liason Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: PSLRA early notice, #2 Exhibit 2: Movants PSLRA certification, #3 Exhibit 3: Movants loss chart, #4 Exhibit 4: firm resume of The Rosen Law Firm, P.A., #5 Exhibit 5: firm resume of Ademi & OReilly, LLP)(Ademi, Shpetim)
April 3, 2017 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support filed by Michael Easley re #11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Movant to serve as Lead Plaintiff in this action MOTION to Appoint Counsel : approving his selection of The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. as Lead Counsel and Ademi & OReilly, LLP as Liaison Counsel for the litigation and all subsequently filed related litigations . (Ademi, Shpetim)
April 3, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Movant to serve as Lead Plaintiff in this action , MOTION to Appoint Counsel : approving his selection of The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. as Lead Counsel and Ademi & OReilly, LLP as Liaison Counsel for the litigation and all subsequently filed related litigations by Michael Easley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order consolidating the related actions; appointing Movant to serve as Lead Plaintiff in this action; and approving his selection of The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. as Lead Counsel and Ademi & OReilly, LLP as Liaison Counsel for the litigation and all subsequently filed related litigations)(Ademi, Shpetim)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/21/2017 APPROVING #9 Stipulation regarding time to move, plead or otherwise respond to the complaint. Please see the court's order for the details. (cc: all counsel)(pwm)
March 10, 2017 Filing 9 STIPULATION (Revised) Regarding Time to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Robert Goss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wagner, K)
March 10, 2017 Filing 8 STIPULATION Regarding Time to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Robert Goss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wagner, K)
March 10, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett M Doran on behalf of Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Brett M. Doran (Doran, Brett)
February 16, 2017 Filing 6 Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Robert Goss. (Wagner, K)
February 6, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Goss. Peter R Armbruster served on 2/2/2017. (Wagner, K)
February 6, 2017 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Goss. Mark A Diblasi served on 2/2/2017. (Wagner, K)
February 6, 2017 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Goss. Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc served on 2/2/2017. (Wagner, K)
February 1, 2017 The court advises the plaintiff that if, within forty-five (45) days of the filing of the complaint, either no answer has been filed or the plaintiff has not filed a certificate of service demonstrating that the plaintiff has properly executed the summons and served the complaint, the court will require the plaintiff to appear at a status conference regarding the delay. (kgw)
February 1, 2017 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (vkb)
January 31, 2017 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Robert Goss. (Wagner, K)
January 31, 2017 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
January 31, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws with Jury Demand; against Peter R Armbruster, Mark A Diblasi, Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Inc. by Robert Goss. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2509946) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons Summons.Armbruster, #3 Summons Summons.Diblasi, #4 Summons Summons.Roadrunner, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagner, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi et al v. Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Goss
Represented By: Alexander A Krot, III
Represented By: Nicholas I Porritt
Represented By: K Scott Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D. Rued
Represented By: Douglas P Baumstein
Represented By: Julian A Lamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCI Equity Partners LLC
Represented By: Patrick F Stokes
Represented By: Anthony S Baish
Represented By: Francis Joseph Warin
Represented By: Jason J Mendro
Represented By: Daniel T Flaherty
Represented By: Nina G Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc
Represented By: Paul T Fox
Represented By: Brett M Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCI Equity Management LP
Represented By: Patrick F Stokes
Represented By: Anthony S Baish
Represented By: Francis Joseph Warin
Represented By: Jason J Mendro
Represented By: Daniel T Flaherty
Represented By: Nina G Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Diblasi
Represented By: Michael W Lieberman
Represented By: Paul T Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter R Armbruster
Represented By: Paul T Fox
Represented By: Andrew R DeVooght
Represented By: C Linna Chen
Represented By: Nina Ruvinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bryan Reifsnyder
Represented By: Anne M Plichta
Represented By: Lewis Kahn
Represented By: Kim E Miller
Represented By: K Scott Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Armin Leuze
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Represented By: Hui M Chang
Represented By: Denise L Morris
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Patrick V Dahlstrom
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Michael Goldberg
Represented By: Sherin Mahdavian
Represented By: Brian Schall
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Easley
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Represented By: Denise L Morris
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Laurence M Rosen
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robert Strougo
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Represented By: Denise L Morris
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Patrick V Dahlstrom
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Laurence M Rosen
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi
Represented By: Jeffrey A Barrack
Represented By: Samuel M Ward
Represented By: Stephen R Basser
Represented By: Mary C Flanner
Represented By: Nola J Hitchcock Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?