von Germeten v. Planet Home Lending LLC
Plaintiff: Dean von Germeten
Defendant: Planet Home Lending LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00167
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Racine
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/2/2019. 97 Defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim GRANTED. 120 Plaintiff's motion to void mortgage and attorney fees DENIED. The court FINDS the record establi shes no basis for plaintiff to assert property interest against personal property of defense counsel or any officer, director or employee of defendant. Case DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state claim. Clerk of Court to accept no further filings in this case from plaintiff and return to plaintiff any documents he files bearing this case number. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Dean von Germeten)(cb)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/23/2019. 101 102 Plaintiff's motions to compel DENIED. 103 Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order/immediate injunctive relief DENIED. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/6/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 222, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Judge Pamela Pepper. By 6/4/2019 defendant to provide the court with authority supporting requests in its motion for sanctions. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Dean von Germeten)(cb)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/21/2019. 53 Plaintiff's motion for declaratory judgment DENIED. 61 Defendant's motion for sanctions DENIED. 63 82 Plaintiff's motions to quash DENIED. 69 Plaintiff's motion for set tlement DENIED. 73 75 76 Plaintiff's motions for court of special equity DENIED. 87 Plaintiff's motion for immediate injunctive relief DENIED. 89 Plaintiff's motion for judgment DENIED. 94 Defendant's motion for sanction s under Rule 11(c) DENIED. 95 Plaintiff's motion to produce evidence and mandatory counter-claim DENIED. Defendants Michael Dubek, Jeffrey Bergida and Mark A. Clauss DISMISSED. Defendant to file responsive pleading. Parties may not begin discovery until the court enters scheduling order setting deadlines for discovery and dispositive motions. Plaintiff may not file any documents of any kind until further order of the court. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Dean von Germeten)(cb)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/26/2018. By end of day 3/23/2018, plaintiff to pay $200 partial filing fee in form accepted by clerk's office. Failure to do so will result in dismissal for failure to pay fee. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Dean VonGermeten-with copy of instructions for making payments)(cb)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/29/2018. 2 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee GRANTED IN PART; plaintiff to pay $200 by 3/23/2018, the court waives the remaining $200 of the filing f ee, if $200 not received by deadline, case will be dismissed for failure to pay the filing fee. 71 Plaintiff's motion to issue cease and desist letter DENIED without prejudice as moot. 8 Plaintiff's motion for order to require defe ndant to send wet ink promissory note to Racine County Clerk DENIED without prejudice as moot. 13 Defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim DENIED without prejudice as moot. 19 Plaintiff's motio n for summary judgment DENIED without prejudice as moot. 24 Plaintiff's motion for final judgment DENIED without prejudice as moot. 28 Plaintiff's second motion for final judgment DENIED without prejudice as moot. 39 Plaintiff's motion for order for forensic audit and motion for discovery/admissions DENIED without prejudice as premature and moot. 49 Defendant's motion to stay discovery GRANTED; neither party to engage in discovery until the court issues a scheduling o rder allowing parties to begin discovery. 50 Plaintiff's motion to quash defendant's motion to dismiss DENIED as moot. 50 Plaintiff's motion to quash defendant's motion to stay discovery DENIED. Plaintiff to file amended compl aint by 3/30/2018, failure to file by deadline will result in dismissal for failure to diligently prosecute and failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Dean von Germeten with copy of complaint for non-prisoner filing without a lawyer)(cb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: von Germeten v. Planet Home Lending LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean von Germeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Home Lending LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?