Moton v. Park Place Hospitality LLC
Plaintiff: Ned Lee Moton
Defendant: Park Place Hospitality LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00178
Filed: February 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS ORDERED that Park Place's motion for summary judgment (Docket # 35 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court will enter judgment accordingly. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Plaintiff ) (ds)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/25/2019 DENYING without prejudice 15 defendant's motion to dismiss. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Ned Moton) (cb)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/10/2017. 2 Plaintiff's MOTION for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee GRANTED. US Marshal to serve copy of amended complaint + attachments, waiver of service form and/or summons, magistrate judge consent/refusal form, and this order on defendant under FRCP 4. Plaintiff to notify clerk's office of any change of address. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Ned Lee Moton)(cb)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/23/2017 REQUIRING the plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 3/17/2017, or face dismissal. (cc: all counsel; by US Mail to plaintiff)(pwm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moton v. Park Place Hospitality LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ned Lee Moton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Place Hospitality LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?