Novoselsky v. Zvunca et al

Plaintiff: David Alan Novoselsky
Defendant: Cristina Zvunca, Jeanine L Stevens and F John Cushing, III
Case Number: 2:2017cv00427
Filed: March 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Kenosha
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 2/16/2018. In accordance with 42 the Court's 12/29/2017 Order, Defendants Jeanine L. Stevens and F. John Cushing, III are AWARDED reasonable attorney's fees in the amount of $12,000.00 agai nst Plaintiff David Alan Novoselsky. Movants Marshall Spiegel, John S. Xydakis, and Neil R. Meccia's 46 Motion to Consolidate is DENIED and 47 Motion for a Litigation Bar is DENIED as moot. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 12/29/2017: GRANTING 40 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Declaration Instanter and GRANTING in part 35 Defendants F. John Cushing, III and Jeanine L. Stevens' Motion for Sanctions. With in 14 days, Movants to FILE a separate motion itemizing and supporting their fees and expenses incurred in this matter, excluding those incurred in connection with the sanctions motion itself. Plaintiff to RESPOND to the fee petition within 14 days from filing; Movants may reply within 5 days thereafter. Movants' motion and Plaintiff's response not to exceed 15 pages, and Movants' reply not to exceed 10 pages. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 7/17/2017: GRANTING 16 Defendants F. John Cushing, III and Jeanine L. Stevens' Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING 20 Defendant Cristina Zvunca's Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING 22 Defendant Cristina Zvunca's Motion to Join Co-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Motions for Preliminary Injunctive Relief; and DENYING 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Action DISMISSED together with costs as taxed by the Clerk of Court. (cc: all counsel) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novoselsky v. Zvunca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristina Zvunca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanine L Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F John Cushing, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Alan Novoselsky
Represented By: David A Novoselsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?