Bowers v. Abele et al
Plaintiff: David Elijah Bowers, Jr
Defendant: Chris Abele and Edward A Flynn
Case Number: 2:2017cv00805
Filed: June 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/24/2019 DENYING 16 plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel. (cc: all counsel, via mail to David Bowers at Wisconsin Resource Center) (cb)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/23/2018. Case DISMISSED for failure to pay filing fee. (cc: all counsel, via mail to David Bowers at Milwaukee Secure Detention Facility)(cb)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/8/2018. 7 Plaintiff's motion for reinstatement of civil complaint/motion to amend GRANTED. 8 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee DENIED; plaintiff to for ward full $400 filing fee to clerk's office by end of day 5/22/2018 or case will be dismissed without further notice or hearing next business day. 10 Plaintiff's motion to consolidate cases DENIED. (cc: all counsel, via mail to David Bowers at Milwaukee Secure Detention Facility-with Guide and Complaint for Prisoner Filing Without Lawyer) (cb)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/21/2017. Case DISMISSED for lack of diligence under Civil L.R. 41(c). Plaintiff may petition for reinstatement within 21 days. (cc: all counsel, via mail to David Elijah Bowers)(cb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Abele et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Elijah Bowers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Abele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward A Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?