Milwaukee World Festival Inc v. Red Lobster Management LLC
Plaintiff: Milwaukee World Festival Inc
Defendant: Red Lobster Management, LLC and Red Lobster Management LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00908
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS ORDERED THAT this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party. (cc: all counsel)(blr)
February 28, 2018 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Milwaukee World Festival Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mark, Monica)
February 1, 2018 Filing 24 STATUS REPORT Parties' Joint by All Plaintiffs. (Mark, Monica)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Adopting parties' stipulation to STAY case pending settlement. All deadlines in the Scheduling Order are removed. If parties have not settled by February 1, 2018, please send a status report. signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 12/12/2017. (cc: all counsel) (cc)
December 11, 2017 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Stay Case Pending Settlement by Milwaukee World Festival Inc. (Mark, Monica)
November 8, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley M Grossberg on behalf of Red Lobster Management LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Lesley M. Grossberg, Nancy Rubner Fransden (Grossberg, Lesley)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS ORDERED: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 10/31/2017, Expert Witnesses due by 2/9/2018, Discovery due by 3/9/2018, Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/10/2018, Responses due 5/1/2018, Replies due 5/11/2018, Final Pretrial Report due 6/25/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 253, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Jury Trial (5 days) set for 7/16/2018 at 09:00 AM at 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) (cc: all counsel)(blr)
October 17, 2017 Filing 20 Minute Entry for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held 10/17/2017 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Parties discuss case. Plaintiff withdraws #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court sets deadlines, final pretrial conference and jury trial dates. (Tape #10:03:48-10:27:25) (blr)
October 10, 2017 Filing 19 Parties Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan and Discovery Plan by Milwaukee World Festival Inc. (Mark, Monica)
September 20, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (in-person) set for 10/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 253, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. The parties' Rule 26(f) Report to be filed by 10/10/2017. (cc: all counsel) (blr)
September 20, 2017 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (blr)
September 19, 2017 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE Statement by Red Lobster Management LLC. (Fathallah, Jason)
September 19, 2017 Filing 16 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Red Lobster Management LLC. (Fathallah, Jason)
September 7, 2017 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 14 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
September 7, 2017 NOTICE TO DEFENDANT - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days (asc)
September 6, 2017 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Red Lobster Management LLC.(Vogt, Heidi)
July 11, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Fathallah on behalf of Red Lobster Management LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Jason R. Fathallah (Fathallah, Jason)
July 11, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi L Vogt on behalf of Red Lobster Management LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Heidi L. Vogt (Vogt, Heidi)
July 10, 2017 Case no longer referred to Judge Lynn Adelman. (blr)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/10/17 DENYING #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Milwaukee World Festival Inc. (cc: all counsel) (gc)
July 6, 2017 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Red Lobster Management LLC - Waiver sent on 7/5/2017. (Mark, Monica)
July 6, 2017 Filing 10 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Milwaukee World Festival Inc. (Mark, Monica)
July 5, 2017 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 REFERRED Judge Lynn Adelman (vkb)
July 5, 2017 Summons Issued as to Red Lobster Management LLC. (blr)
July 5, 2017 Filing 9 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (blr)
June 30, 2017 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
June 30, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica A Mark on behalf of Milwaukee World Festival Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Monica A. Mark (Mark, Monica)
June 30, 2017 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Milwaukee World Festival Inc. (Polakowski, Jessica)
June 30, 2017 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Jessica H. Polakowski (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Milwaukee World Festival's trademark registration, #2 Exhibit B: Plaintiff's June 16, 2016 letter, #3 Exhibit C: Defendant's June 17, 2016 letter, #4 Exhibit D: Plaintiff's June 21, 2016 letter, #5 Exhibit E: Defendant's June 24, 2016 letter, #6 Exhibit F: Plaintiff's July 8, 2016 letter, #7 Exhibit G: Plaintiff's June 6, 2017 letter, #8 Exhibit H: Defendant's June 9, 2017 letter, #9 Exhibit I: Plaintiff's June 22, 2017 letter, #10 Exhibit J: Defendant's June 23 e-mail)(Polakowski, Jessica)
June 30, 2017 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Frank Nicotera (Polakowski, Jessica)
June 30, 2017 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support filed by Milwaukee World Festival Inc re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Polakowski, Jessica)
June 30, 2017 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Milwaukee World Festival Inc. (Polakowski, Jessica) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2017: #1 Proposed Order) (amb).
June 30, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Milwaukee World Festival Inc. (Polakowski, Jessica) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2017: #1 Proposed Order) (amb).
June 30, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Red Lobster Management, LLC by Milwaukee World Festival Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2613416) (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A: Trademark registration, #4 Exhibit B: Plaintiff's June 16, 2016 letter, #5 Exhibit C: Defendant's June 17, 2016 letter, #6 Exhibit D: Correspondence between parties, #7 Exhibit E: Correspondence between parties, #8 Exhibit F: Correspondence between parties, #9 Exhibit G: Plaintiff's June 6, 2017 letter, #10 Exhibit H: Defendant's June 9, 2017 letter, #11 Exhibit I: Plaintiff's June 22, 2017 letter, #12 Exhibit J: Defendant's June 23 e-mail)(Polakowski, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milwaukee World Festival Inc v. Red Lobster Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Lobster Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Lobster Management LLC
Represented By: Nancy Rubner Frandsen
Represented By: Heidi L Vogt
Represented By: Lesley M Grossberg
Represented By: Jason R Fathallah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milwaukee World Festival Inc
Represented By: Jessica Hutson Polakowski
Represented By: Monica A Mark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?