Lampley v. Latour et al
Plaintiff: |
Steven Lampley |
Defendant: |
Officer Latour, Dr Schwartz-Oscar, Sgt Rosmerinouski, Kathy Lemmons and CO Johnson |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01132 |
Filed: |
August 16, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin |
Office: |
Milwaukee Office |
County: |
Brown |
Presiding Judge: |
Pamela Pepper |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 9, 2019 |
Filing
55
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/9/2019. 35 Defendants' motion for summary judgment GRANTED IN PART as to Kathy Lemens; defendant Lemens DISMISSED. 49 Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment DENIED. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Steven Lampley)(cb)
|
March 26, 2019 |
Filing
33
ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/26/2019. 31 Defendants' motion to stay deadlines pending notification of address by plaintiff DENIED as moot. 32 Plaintiff's motion for extension GRANTED; discovery now due 4/30/2019, dispositive motions now due 5/31/2019. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Steven Lampley)(cb)
|
December 4, 2018 |
Filing
30
ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/4/2018 DENYING 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Order for Discovery Documents. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Steven Lampley at Green Bay Correctional Institution) (cb)
|
August 21, 2018 |
Filing
28
ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/21/2018. 26 Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration DENIED. 26 Plaintiff's motion for extension of deadlines GRANTED; discovery now due 3/29/2019; dispositive motions now due 4/30/2019. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Steven Lampley at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(cb)
|
March 27, 2018 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/27/2018. 2 Plaintiff's motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee GRANTED; agency having custody of the plaintiff shall collect $350 filing fee from plaintiff's prison trust accoun t under 28 USC §1915(b)(2). 5 Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to submit trust account statement DENIED as moot. 11 Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel DENIED without prejudice. Defendants Rosmerinouski and Schwartz-Osca r DISMISSED. Defendants Latour, Johnson and Lemmons to file responsive pleading to complaint within 60 days. Parties may not begin discovery until the court enters scheduling order setting deadlines for discovery and dispositive motions. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Steven Lampley-with Guide for Prisoners Representing Themselves and Warden at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(cb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?