Barfell v. Correctional Health Care Companies et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Henry Lee Barfell
Defendant: Correctional Health Care Companies, Winnebago County Jail, Aramark, Department of Probation & Parole and Oshkosh Police Department
Case Number: 2:2017cv01365
Filed: October 6, 2017
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Winnebago
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2018 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 8/28/18 DENYING Plaintiff's 34 Motion to Compel and GRANTING Plaintiff's 40 Motion for extension of time. The parties must complete all discovery by 10/19/2018 and file dispositive mo tions on or before 11/19/18. Plaintiff shall execute a written authorization granting Defendants access to his medical records on or before 9/11/18. In the event Plaintiff fails to do so, this case may be dismissed. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Thomas Barfell) (Griesbach, William)
July 17, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion to Compel. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Thomas Barfell) (Griesbach, William)
April 16, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 4/16/2018 re 10 Amended Complaint. Defendants Correctional Health Care Companies, Winnebago County Jail, Sgt. Makurat, John Matz, Sgt. Durrant, Sgt Manthey, and CPI Tuttle DISMISSED from action. Plaintiff PERMITTED to proceed on Eighth Amendment claim for deliberate indifference to serious medical needs against Defendants Nurse Katrina and Dr. Anuligo. U.S. Marshals Service to SERVE copy of Amended Complaint and this Order on Defend ants Nurse Katrina and Dr. Anuligo, who shall FILE a responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint. 7 and 14 Plaintiff's Motions to Appoint Counsel DENIED without prejudice. Case RETURNED to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for further proceedings. Parties may not begin discovery until after a Scheduling Order is entered. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Thomas H L Barfell at Winnebago County Jail)(jm)
February 23, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 2/23/18. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that Barfell's motion to consolidate cases (ECF No. 13 ) is DENIED. Barfell must notify the court, on or before March 16, 2018, if he wants to voluntarily dismiss any of his lawsuits. (cc: all counsel, to plaintiff via USPS) (mlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barfell v. Correctional Health Care Companies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Henry Lee Barfell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Health Care Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winnebago County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Probation & Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oshkosh Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?